HAND et al v. SCOTT et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH, WILLIAM BASS, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS and YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA
Defendant: RICK SCOTT, PAM BONDI, JEFF ATWATER, ADAM H PUTNAM, KEN DETZNER, JULIE L JONES, MELINDA N COONROD, RICHARD D DAVISON, DAVID A WYANT and JULIA MCCALL
Case Number: 4:2017cv00128
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: MARK E WALKER
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2018 RESet Deadline re 162 Notice of Appeal. (Clerk to check status of Appeal on 10/6/2018.), Appeal STATUS (7/5/2018) Deadline Terminated -- Appeal still pending. (kdm)
June 8, 2018 Filing 179 Letter dated 6/4/2018 from JANET L WRIGHT (vkm)
May 3, 2018 Filing 177 ORIGINAL PAPERS to US Court of Appeals re 162 Notice of Appeal Number of Volumes: 2 - Volume 1 of 2 containing Sealed Plaintiff's Exhibits 1-8, Doc. 100 (1 disc); Plaintiff's Exhibits 113 & 116-177, Doc. 101 (64 discs) and Volume 2 of 2 containing Sealed Defendant's Exhibits M-T, Doc. 108 (also contained on 1 disc, Doc. 109 ); Sealed Plaintiff's Unredacted Motion for Summary Judgment, Doc. 176 (Filed with the Court on November 13, 2017) (vkm)
May 3, 2018 Filing 176 SEALED PLAINTIFF'S UNREDACTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (FILED WITH THE COURT ON NOVEMBER 13, 2017) RE 114 THRU 134 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (vkm)
April 30, 2018 Filing 175 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Northern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: 162 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 18-11388-G. The entire record on appeal is available electronically EXCEPT 100 , 101 , and 109 SEALED EXHIBITS. (vkm)
April 30, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE of Filing Transcript (Part III) by Court Reporter in District Court - re: 162 Notice of Appeal, 170 Transcript Request Appeal Part I, 171 Transcript Acknowledgment - Part II Court Reporter: Megan A. Hague Certificate of Readiness due by 4/30/2018. (mah)
April 29, 2018 Filing 173 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/12/2017, before Judge Mark Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan A. Hague, Telephone number 850-422-0011. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/7/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2018. (mah)
April 19, 2018 Filing 171 TRANSCRIPT Acknowledgment - Part II re 162 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter:Megan A. Hague Transcript due by 5/19/2018. (mah)
April 19, 2018 Filing 170 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT for proceedings held on 04/12/2017, 08/11/2017 before Judge Hon. Mark E. Walker, re 162 Notice of Appeal, 168 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Transcript due by 4/19/2018. (PRATT, JORDAN)
April 6, 2018 Filing 172 USCA Case Number 18-11388-G for 162 NOTICE OF APPEAL. (vkm)
April 5, 2018 Set Deadline re 162 Notice of Appeal: Clerk to check status of Appeal on 7/5/2018. (vkm)
April 5, 2018 Filing 169 Appeal Instructions re: 162 Notice of Appeal: The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 4/19/2018. (vkm)
April 5, 2018 Filing 168 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 162 Notice of Appeal (vkm)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' 163 MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL - This Court also DENIES Defendants' alternative request to toll the remedial 30-day period pending their appeals. Defendants remain bound by the timeframe set out in its Order Directing Entry of Judgment. ECF No. 160 . Defendants shall promulgate executive clemency rules that pass constitutional muster on or before April 26, 2018. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/4/2018. (vkm)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER HOLDING IN ABEYANCE PROCEEDINGS REGARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS DURING THE PENDENCY OF APPEAL - The joint motion ECF No. 164 , is DENIED as moot. Construed by this Court as a joint motion, the Joint Stipulation, ECF No. 165 , is GRANTED. All fee and cost issues shall be held in abeyance until such time as any appellate proceeding and proceedings before the U.S. Supreme Court have ended. The parties shall have fourteen days after proceedings before the U.S. Supreme Court have ended to file a motion for entitlement to attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/4/2018. (vkm)
April 4, 2018 Filing 165 ***CONSTRUED AS A JOINT MOTION PER 166 ORDER***STIPULATION re 164 Joint MOTION to Extend Time and Hold in Abeyance Proceedings Regarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 4/4/2018 (vkm).
April 4, 2018 Filing 164 Joint MOTION to Extend Time and Hold in Abeyance Proceedings Regarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
April 4, 2018 Filing 163 MOTION to Stay re 162 Notice of Appeal, 160 Order,,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Julia McCall) (AGARWAL, AMIT)
April 4, 2018 Filing 162 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 160 Order,,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. ( Filing fee $505 Receipt Number AFLNDC-4140556.) (AGARWAL, AMIT)
March 27, 2018 Filing 161 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to 160 ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (vkm)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - For the reasons set forth in its prior order, ECF No. 144 , dated February 1, 2018, and this Order, the Clerk shall enter judgment stating: "FLA. CONST. art. VI, § 4(a), FLA. CONST. art. IV § 8, FLA. STAT. § 97.041(2)(b), FLA. STAT. § 944.292(1), and the Florida Rules of Executive Clemency, violate the First and Fourteenth Amendments of the United States Constitution to the extent these provisions provide the Executive Clemency Board unfettered discretion to grant or deny restoration of voting rights to persons with felony convictions, and violate the First Amendment to the extent these provisions lack any time constraints for processing and making final decisions. This DECLARATORY JUDGMENT applies only to the right to vote, not to any other civil right. It does not apply to any other type of executive clemency in Florida. Defendants are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing the current unconstitutional vote-restoration scheme. Defendants are also PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from ending all vote-restoration processes. On or before April 26, 2018, Defendants shall promulgate specific and neutral criteria to direct vote-restoration decisions in accordance with this Order. On or before April 26, 2018, Defendants shall also promulgate meaningful, specific, and expeditious time constraints in accordance with this Order. Defendants shall file with this Court its modified rules on or before 4/26/2018". Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/27/2018. (vkm)
March 14, 2018 Reset Deadline Re: 21 Initial Scheduling Order - Status Report due by 4/11/2018. (vkm)
February 23, 2018 Filing 159 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by MARK R SCHLAKMAN. (cle)
February 21, 2018 Filing 158 RESPONSE in Opposition re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED VERSION) Response to Plaintiffs' Brief on Remedies filed by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (AGARWAL, AMIT)
February 20, 2018 Filing 157 RESPONSE by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH re 149 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' BRIEF ON REMEDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Proposed Judgment) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
February 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING 155 MOTION FOR LEAVETO FILE AMICUS CURIAE as to MARK R. SCHLAKMAN. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/19/18. (pll)
February 16, 2018 Filing 155 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FOR PURPOSES OF ASSISTING THE COURT AS IT CONSIDERS AN APPROPRIATE REMEDY IN THESE PROCEEDINGS filed by MARK R SCHLAKMAN. (vkm)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER DENYING 153 MOTION TO RECONSIDER MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/16/2018. (vkm)
February 15, 2018 Filing 153 MOTION TO RECONSIDER MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF WITH BRIEF TENDERED re 146 Order, filed by JOHN B. THOMPSON. (vkm)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING 151 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S BRIEF ON REMEDIES - Each side may file a response to the other side's Brief on Remedies on or before 2/21/2018 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/14/2018. (vkm)
February 14, 2018 Filing 151 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Response to Defendants' Brief on Remedies by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER DENYING 104 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/13/2018. (tdl)
February 12, 2018 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED VERSION) Supplemental Brief on Remedies filed by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (AGARWAL, AMIT)
February 12, 2018 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD M WENGER on behalf of All Defendants (WENGER, EDWARD)
February 12, 2018 Filing 147 MEMORANDUM in Support re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED VERSION) (SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM REGARDING REMEDY) filed by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
February 12, 2018 Reset Deadline Re: 21 Initial Scheduling Order - Status Report due by 3/12/2018. (vkm)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER DENYING 145 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/9/2018. (vkm)
February 7, 2018 Filing 145 MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by JOHN B THOMPSON. (vkm)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER ON 102 , 103 CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment as to Counts One, Two, and Three is GRANTED. Defendants motion for summary judgment as to Counts One, Two, and Three is DENIED. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment as to Count Four is DENIED. Defendants motion for summary judgment as to Count Four is GRANTED. Parties shall file briefings related to remedies on or before Monday, February 12, 2018. ( Briefings Deadline - by 2/12/2018.). Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/1/18. (pll)
December 12, 2017 Reset Deadline Re: 21 Initial Scheduling Order - Status Report due by 1/10/2018. (vkm)
December 11, 2017 Filing 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re 104 MOTION to Certify Class filed by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 11, 2017 Filing 142 REPLY to Response to Motion re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED VERSION) filed by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Transcript of August 11, 2017 Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Confidential Case Analyses) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 11, 2017 Filing 141 REPLY to Response to Motion re 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (AGARWAL, AMIT)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER GRANTING 139 MOTION TO EXPAND WORD LIMIT. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/8/2017. (vkm)
December 8, 2017 Filing 139 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (PRATT, JORDAN)
December 7, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/11/2017, before Judge Mark Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber 850-422-0011, Telephone number Megan A. Hague. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2018. (mah)
December 4, 2017 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED VERSION) filed by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (AGARWAL, AMIT)
December 4, 2017 Filing 136 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Applications for Clemency (1967 - 1969)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 4, 2017 Filing 135 RESPONSE in Opposition re 104 MOTION to Certify Class filed by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (NEFF, LANCE)
November 21, 2017 Reset Deadline Re: 21 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/11/2017. (vkm)
November 16, 2017 Filing 134 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 97-4: ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 20, 2007) (Ex. 115)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 133 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 97-2: ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 1, 2007) (Ex. 112), # 2 Exhibit DE 97-3: ECB Hearing Transcript (June 14, 2007) (Ex. 114)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 132 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 96-4: ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 21, 2006) (Ex. 110), # 2 Exhibit DE 97-1: ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 7, 2006) (Ex. 111)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 131 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 96-2: ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 2, 2006 Vol. 2) (Ex. 108), # 2 Exhibit DE 96-3: ECB Hearing Transcript (June 15, 2006) (Ex. 109)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 130 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 95-5: ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 6, 2005) (Ex. 106), # 2 Exhibit DE 96-1: ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 2, 2006 Vol. 1) (Ex. 107)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 95-2: ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 3, 2005) (Ex. 103), # 2 Exhibit DE 95-3: ECB Hearing Transcript (June 23, 2005) (Ex. 104), # 3 Exhibit DE 95-4: ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 8, 2005) (Ex. 105)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 128 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 94-5: ECB Hearing Transcript (June 17, 2004) (Ex. 100), # 2 Exhibit DE 94-6: ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 23, 2004) (Ex. 101), # 3 Exhibit DE 95-1: ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 9, 2004) (Ex. 102)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 127 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 94-2: ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 25, 2003) (Ex. 97), # 2 Exhibit DE 94-3: ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 11, 2003) (Ex. 98), # 3 Exhibit DE 94-4: ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 18, 2004) (Ex. 99)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 126 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 93-5: ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 12, 2002) (Ex. 94), # 2 Exhibit DE 93-6: ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 27, 2003) (Ex. 95), # 3 Exhibit DE 94-1: ECB Hearing Transcript (June 20, 2003) (Ex. 96)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 125 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 93-2: ECB Hearing Transcript (Feb. 21, 2002) (DE 91), # 2 Exhibit DE 93-3: ECB Hearing Transcript (June 13, 2002) (DE 92), # 3 Exhibit DE 93-4: ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 26, 2002) (DE 93)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 124 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 92-5: ECB Hearing Transcript (June 14, 2001) (Ex. 88), # 2 Exhibit DE 92-6: ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 13, 2001) (Ex. 89), # 3 Exhibit DE 93-1: ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 13, 2001) (Ex. 90)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 123 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 92-2: ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 14, 2000) (Ex. 85), # 2 Exhibit DE 92-3: ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 14, 2000) (Ex. 86), # 3 Exhibit DE 92-4: ECB Hearing Transcript (Feb. 22, 2001) (Ex. 87) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 91-4: ECB Hearing Transcript (Oct. 28, 1999) (Ex. 81), # 2 Exhibit DE 91-5: ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 9, 1999) (Ex. 82), # 3 Exhibit DE 91-6: ECB Hearing Transcript (Feb. 17, 2000) (Ex. 83), # 4 Exhibit DE 92-1: ECB Hearing Transcript (June 15, 2000) (Ex. 84)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 91-1: ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 10, 1998 Vol. 2) (Ex. 78), # 2 Exhibit DE 91-2: ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 11, 1999) (Ex. 79), # 3 Exhibit DE 91-3: ECB Hearing Transcript (June 10, 1999) (Ex. 80)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 120 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 90-3: ECB Hearing Transcript (June 11, 1998), # 2 Exhibit DE 90-4: ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 17, 1998), # 3 Exhibit DE 90-5: ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 10, 1998 Vol. 1)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 119 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 89-15: ECB Hearing Transcript (June 11, 1997) (Ex. 71), # 2 Exhibit DE 89-16: ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 10, 1997) (Ex. 72), # 3 Exhibit DE 90-1: ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 3, 1997) (Ex. 73), # 4 Exhibit DE 90-2: ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 12, 1998) (Ex. 74)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 118 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 89-9: 2014 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 65), # 2 Exhibit DE 89-10: 2015 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 66), # 3 Exhibit DE 89-11: 2016 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 67), # 4 Exhibit DE 89-12: 2017 ECB Annotated Agendas (through June 2017 ECB hearing) (Ex. 68), # 5 Exhibit DE 89-13: ECB Hearing Transcript (Jan. 7, 1997) (Ex. 69), # 6 Exhibit DE 89-14: ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 13, 1997) (Ex. 70)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 117 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 88-5: 2000 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 51), # 2 Exhibit DE 88-6: 2001 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 52), # 3 Exhibit DE 88-7: 2002 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 53), # 4 Exhibit DE 88-8: 2003 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 54), # 5 Exhibit DE 88-9: 2004 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 55), # 6 Exhibit DE 88-10: 2005 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 56), # 7 Exhibit DE 89-1: 2006 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 57), # 8 Exhibit DE 89-2: 2007 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 58), # 9 Exhibit DE 89-3: 2008 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 59), # 10 Exhibit DE 89-4: 2009 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 60), # 11 Exhibit DE 89-5: 2010 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 61), # 12 Exhibit DE 89-6: 2011 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 62), # 13 Exhibit DE 89-7: 2012 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 63), # 14 Exhibit DE 89-8: 2013 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 64)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 116 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 87-3: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Third Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Ex. 45), # 2 Exhibit DE 87-4: Certified Report of Paul Antoine Criminal Records from Miami-Dade County (Ex. 46), # 3 Exhibit DE 88-1: Certified Copies of Kevin Michael Grenier Criminal Records from Brevard County (Ex. 47), # 4 Exhibit DE 88-2: 1997 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 48), # 5 Exhibit DE 88-3: 1998 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 49), # 6 Exhibit DE 88-4: 1999 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 50)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 115 NOTICE OF REFILING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 86-7: ECB Defendants Response to First Set, RFP No. 6 Restoration Application Disqualification Chart (Ex.33), # 2 Exhibit DE 86-8: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, RFP No. 7 Communications and Executive Orders re: Under Advisement Cases (Ex. 34), # 3 Exhibit DE 86-9: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 1 (Ex. 35), # 4 Exhibit DE 86-10: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 2 (Ex. 36), # 5 Exhibit DE 86-11: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 3 (Ex. 37), # 6 Exhibit DE 86-12: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 4 (Ex. 38), # 7 Exhibit DE 86-13: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 5 (Ex. 39), # 8 Exhibit DE 86-14: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 7 (Ex. 40), # 9 Exhibit DE 86-15: Secretary of Corrections Joness Response to Plaintiffs Second Set, Request for Production No. 1 (Ex. 41), # 10 Exhibit DE 86-16: Florida Department of Corrections Annual Report 2013-14 (Ex. 42), # 11 Exhibit DE 87-1: Florida Department of Corrections Annual Report 2014-15 (Ex. 43), # 12 Exhibit DE 87-2: Florida Department of Corrections Annual Report 2015-16 (Ex. 44)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Filing 114 NOTICE of Refiling of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 85-15: Historical and Current Versions of Florida Rules of Executive Clemency (Ex. 23), # 2 Exhibit DE 86-3: Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2013 (Ex. 29), # 3 Exhibit DE 86-4: Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2014 (Ex. 30), # 4 Exhibit DE 86-5: Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2015 (Ex. 31), # 5 Exhibit DE 86-6: Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2016 (Ex. 32)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING 110 MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBITS AND SUBSTITUTE WITH REDACTED VERSIONS - Exhibits Nos. 103 -4, 103 -5, and 103 -8 are stricken from ECF No. 103 and the redacted versions of the exhibits attached to the motion are accepted as filed. The substituted exhibits shall now be cited as ECF Nos. 110 -1, 110 -2, and 110 -3 respectively. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/16/2017. (vkm)
November 16, 2017 Filing 112 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Refiling of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 85-15: Historical and Current Versions of Florida Rules of Executive Clemency (Ex. 23), # 2 Exhibit DE 86-3: Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2013 (Ex. 29), # 3 Exhibit DE 86-4: Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2014 (Ex. 30), # 4 Exhibit DE 86-5: Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2015 (Ex. 31), # 5 Exhibit DE 86-6: Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2016 (Ex. 32), # 6 Exhibit DE 86-7: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Request for Production No. 6 Restoration of Civil Rights Application Disqualification Chart (2013-2017) (Ex. 33), # 7 Exhibit DE 86-8: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Request for Production No. 7 Communications and Executive Orders re: Under Advisement Cases (Ex. 34), # 8 Exhibit DE 86-9: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 1 (Ex. 35), # 9 Exhibit DE 86-10: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 2 (Ex. 36), # 10 Exhibit DE 86-11: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 3 (Ex. 37), # 11 Exhibit DE 86-12: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 4 (Ex. 38), # 12 Exhibit DE 86-13: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 5 (Ex. 39), # 13 Exhibit DE 86-14: ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 7 (Ex. 40)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 16, 2017 Filing 111 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Under Seal by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT re 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment (NEFF, LANCE)
November 16, 2017 Filing 110 MOTION to Strike 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment Exhibits and Substitute with Redacted Versions by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/30/2017). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Redacted Smith Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit Redacted Bass Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit Redacted Exline Affidavit) (NEFF, LANCE)
November 15, 2017 Filing 107 Third NOTICE of Re-Filing Exhibits by PAM BONDI, MELINDA N COONROD, RICHARD D DAVISON, KEN DETZNER, JULIE L JONES, JULIA MCCALL, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT, DAVID A WYANT re 106 Notice (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Exhibit J, # 2 Defendant's Exhibit K, # 3 Defendant's Exhibit L) (pll)
November 14, 2017 Filing 109 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re 108 - 1 DISC RECEIVED CONTAINING DEFENDANT'S SEALED EXHIBITS M - T (vkm)
November 14, 2017 Filing 108 DEFENDANTS' EXHIBITS M - T TO 103 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N, # 2 Exhibit O, # 3 Exhibit P, # 4 Exhibit Q, # 5 Exhibit R, # 6 Exhibit S, # 7 Exhibit T) (vkm)
November 14, 2017 Filing 106 ***SEE 107 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTION***NOTICE of Re-Filing Exhibits by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (PRATT, JORDAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to refer to recent correction (vkm).
November 14, 2017 Filing 105 ***SEE 107 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTION***NOTICE of Re-Filing Exhibits by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (PRATT, JORDAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to refer to recent correction (vkm).
November 13, 2017 Filing 104 MOTION to Certify Class by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/27/2017). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC Firm Resume) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 13, 2017 Filing 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 12/4/2017). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit - STRICKEN PER 113 ORDER, # 5 Exhibit - STRICKEN PER 113 ORDER, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit - STRICKEN PER 113 ORDER, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit) (AGARWAL, AMIT) Modified on 11/16/2017 to reflect stricken exhibits (vkm).
November 13, 2017 Filing 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED VERSION) by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 12/4/2017). (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 13, 2017 Filing 101 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re 85 NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment - EXHIBITS 113 AND 116 - 177 RECEIVED ON INDIVIDUAL DISCS. (vkm)
November 13, 2017 Filing 100 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re 85 NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment - 1 DISC CONTAINING SEALED EXHIBITS 1-8 RECEIVED. (vkm)
November 13, 2017 Filing 99 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FLORIDA CONSTITUTION REVISION COMMISSION VIDEO RECORDING by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 13, 2017 Filing 98 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF DE 87 -4 AND DE 88 -1 (CERTIFIED CRIMINAL RECORDS) by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/14/2017 to add document relationship (vkm).
November 12, 2017 Filing 97 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 7, 2006) (Ex. 111), # 2 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 1, 2007) (Ex. 112), # 3 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (June 14, 2007) (Ex. 114), # 4 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 20, 2007) (Ex. 115)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 12, 2017 Filing 96 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 2, 2006 Vol. 1) (Ex. 107), # 2 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 2, 2006 Vol. 2) (Ex. 108), # 3 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (June 15, 2006) (Ex. 109), # 4 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 21, 2006) (Ex. 110)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 12, 2017 Filing 95 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 9, 2004) (Ex. 102), # 2 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 3, 2005) (Ex. 103), # 3 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (June 23, 2005) (Ex. 104), # 4 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 8, 2005) (Ex. 105), # 5 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 6, 2005) (Ex. 106)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 12, 2017 Filing 94 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (June 20, 2003) (Ex. 96), # 2 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 25, 2003) (Ex. 97), # 3 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 11, 2003) (Ex. 98), # 4 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 18, 2004) (Ex. 99), # 5 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (June 17, 2004) (Ex. 100), # 6 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 23, 2004) (Ex. 101)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 12, 2017 Filing 93 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 13, 2001) (Ex. 90), # 2 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Feb. 21, 2002) (Ex. 91), # 3 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (June 13, 2002) (Ex. 92), # 4 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 26, 2002) (Ex. 93), # 5 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 12, 2002) (Ex. 94), # 6 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 27, 2003) (Ex. 95)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 12, 2017 Filing 92 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (June 15, 2000) (Ex. 84), # 2 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 14, 2000) (Ex. 85), # 3 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 14, 2000) (Ex. 86), # 4 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Feb. 22, 2001) (Ex. 87), # 5 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (June 14, 2001) (Ex. 88), # 6 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 13, 2001) (Ex. 89)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 12, 2017 Filing 91 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 10, 1998 Vol. 2) (Ex. 78), # 2 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 11, 1999) (Ex. 79), # 3 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (June 10, 1999) (Ex. 80), # 4 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Oct. 28, 1999) (Ex. 81), # 5 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 9, 1999) (Ex. 82), # 6 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Feb. 17, 2000) (Ex. 83)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 12, 2017 Filing 90 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 3, 1997) (Ex. 73), # 2 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 12, 1998) (Ex. 74), # 3 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (June 11, 1998) (Ex. 75), # 4 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 17, 1998) (Ex. 76), # 5 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Dec. 10, 1998 Vol. 1) (Ex. 77)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 12, 2017 Filing 89 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2006 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 57), # 2 Exhibit 2007 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 58), # 3 Exhibit 2008 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 59), # 4 Exhibit 2009 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 60), # 5 Exhibit 2010 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 61), # 6 Exhibit 2011 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 62), # 7 Exhibit 2012 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 63), # 8 Exhibit 2013 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 64), # 9 Exhibit 2014 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 65), # 10 Exhibit 2015 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 66), # 11 Exhibit 2016 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 67), # 12 Exhibit 2017 ECB Annotated Agendas (through June 2017 ECB hearing) (Ex. 68), # 13 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Jan. 7, 1997) (Ex. 69), # 14 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Mar. 13, 1997) (Ex. 70), # 15 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (June 11, 1997) (Ex. 71), # 16 Exhibit ECB Hearing Transcript (Sept. 10, 1997) (Ex. 72)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 12, 2017 Filing 88 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Copies of Kevin Michael Grenier Criminal Records from Brevard County (Ex. 47), # 2 Exhibit 1997 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 48), # 3 Exhibit 1998 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 49), # 4 Exhibit 1999 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 50), # 5 Exhibit 2000 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 51), # 6 Exhibit 2001 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 52), # 7 Exhibit 2002 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 53), # 8 Exhibit 2003 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 54), # 9 Exhibit 2004 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 55), # 10 Exhibit 2005 ECB Annotated Agendas (Ex. 56)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 12, 2017 Filing 87 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Florida Department of Corrections Annual Report 2014-15 (Ex. 43), # 2 Exhibit Florida Department of Corrections Annual Report 2015-16 (Ex. 44), # 3 Exhibit ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Third Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Ex. 45), # 4 Exhibit Certified Report of Paul Antoine Criminal Records from Miami-Dade County (Ex. 46)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 12, 2017 Filing 86 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2010-2011 (Ex. 27), # 2 Exhibit Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2011-2012 (Ex. 28), # 3 Exhibit Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2013 (Ex. 29), # 4 Exhibit Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2014 (Ex. 30), # 5 Exhibit Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2015 (Ex. 31), # 6 Exhibit Florida Commission on Offender Review Annual Report 2016 (Ex. 32), # 7 Exhibit ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Request for Production No. 6 Restoration of Civil Rights Application Disqualification Chart (2013-2017) (Ex. 33), # 8 Exhibit ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Request for Production No. 7 Communications and Executive Orders re: Under Advisement Cases (Ex. 34), # 9 Exhibit ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 1 (Ex. 35), # 10 Exhibit ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 2 (Ex. 36), # 11 Exhibit ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 3 (Ex. 37), # 12 Exhibit ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 4 (Ex. 38), # 13 Exhibit ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 5 (Ex. 39), # 14 Exhibit ECB Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Interrogatory No. 7 (Ex. 40), # 15 Exhibit Secretary of Corrections Joness Response to Plaintiffs Second Set, Request for Production No. 1 (Ex. 41), # 16 Exhibit Florida Department of Corrections Annual Report 2013-14 (Ex. 42)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 12, 2017 Filing 85 ***SEE 114 - 134 FOR MOST RECENT CORRECTIONS***NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Stipulation Regarding Authenticity and Admissibility of Evidence (Ex. 9), # 2 Exhibit Plaintiff James Michael Hand Affidavit (Ex. 10), # 3 Exhibit Plaintiff Joseph James Galasso Affidavit (Ex. 11), # 4 Exhibit Plaintiff Harold W. Gircsis, Jr. Affidavit (Ex. 12), # 5 Exhibit Plaintiff Christopher Michael Smith Affidavit (Ex. 13), # 6 Exhibit Plaintiff William Bass Affidavit (Ex. 14), # 7 Exhibit Plaintiff Jermaine Johnekins Affidavit (Ex. 15), # 8 Exhibit Plaintiff Virginia Kay Atkins Affidavit (Ex. 16), # 9 Exhibit Plaintiff James Larry Exline Affidavit (Ex. 17), # 10 Exhibit Plaintiff Yraida Leonides Guanipa Affidavit (Ex. 18), # 11 Exhibit Executive Clemency Board (hereinafter ECB) Defendants Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (Ex. 19), # 12 Exhibit ECB Defendants Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production (Ex. 20), # 13 Exhibit Secretary of Corrections Joness Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (Ex. 21), # 14 Exhibit Secretary of Corrections Joness Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production (Ex. 22), # 15 Exhibit Historical and Current Versions of Florida Rules of Executive Clemency (Ex. 23), # 16 Exhibit Florida Commission on Offender Review Defendants Response to First Set of Requests for Production (Ex. 24), # 17 Exhibit Florida Commission on Offender Review Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Request for Production No. 2, Application for Clemency (Current) (Ex. 25), # 18 Exhibit Florida Commission on Offender Review Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set, Request for Production No. 2, Application for Clemency (Previous) (Ex. 26)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 11/17/2017 to reference recent corrections (vkm).
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING 83 JOINT MOTION TO FILE EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/9/2017. (vkm)
November 9, 2017 Filing 83 Joint MOTION to Seal by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (NEFF, LANCE)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING 81 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE WORD LIMIT. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/8/17. (ckm)
November 7, 2017 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to File Longer Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Unopposed) by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
November 2, 2017 Filing 80 ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint, by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (NEFF, LANCE)
October 11, 2017 Reset Deadline Re: 21 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/9/2017. (vkm)
October 10, 2017 Filing 79 STATUS REPORT JOINT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADMITTING MICHELLE KANTER COHEN PRO HAC VICE - This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michelle E. Kanter Cohen. ECF No. 77 . Ms. Kanter Cohen has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED and Ms. Kanter Cohen is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/5/2017. (vkm)
October 4, 2017 Filing 77 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michelle E. Kanter Cohen.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-3990737.) by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (KANTER COHEN, MICHELLE)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/4/2017. (vkm)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED 73 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT - Defendants shall file their responsive pleading(s) to the amended complaint on or before 11/2/2017. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/3/2017. (vkm)
October 3, 2017 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re 69 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (NEFF, LANCE)
October 3, 2017 Filing 73 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 29 Amended Complaint, by PAM BONDI, JIMMY PATRONIS, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (NEFF, LANCE) Modified on 10/4/2017 to reflect unopposed motion (vkm).
September 28, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE of Refiled Exhibits F, G and H for DE 69 Motion to Compel (Refiled With Blank Last Page Due to CM ECF Error with Last Exhibit Page) by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH re 69 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit G for DE 69 Motion to Compel (Refiled With Blank Last Page Due to CM ECF Error with Last Exhibit Page), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit H for DE 69 Motion to Compel (Refiled With Blank Last Page Due to CM ECF Error with Last Exhibit Page)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
September 28, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE of Exhibits F, G and H for DE 69 Motion to Compel, Refiled Due to Size Limitations by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH re 69 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit G for No. 69 Motion to Compel (Refiled Due to Size Limitation), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit H for No. 69 Motion to Compel (Refiled Due to Size Limitation)) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DIRECTING EXPEDITED RESPONSE AND SUBSTITUTING DEFENDANT'S SUCCESSOR re 69 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION - Response to motion due by by 10/4/2017. Additionally, this Court treats Plaintiffs footnote 1 in the Motion to Compel, see ECF No. 69 at 1, as a motion to substitute former Chief Financial Officer Jeff Atwater with Chief Financial Officer Jimmy Patronis. This Court treats this motion as unopposed. It is accordingly GRANTED. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/27/2017. (vkm)
September 26, 2017 Set Deadline as to 69 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/10/2017). (vkm)
September 26, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery Requests to Executive Clemency Board Defendants, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Third Set of Discovery Requests to Executive Clemency Board Defendants, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Discovery Requests to Executive Clemency Board Defendants, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Defendants' Signed Partial Response to Interrogatory No. 1 in Third Set of Discovery Requests, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Sample Annotated Agenda from March 2015 Executive Clemency Board Hearing, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Excerpt from December 14, 2000 Executive Clemency Board Hearing Transcript, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Excerpt from December 3, 1997 Executive Clemency Board Hearing Transcript) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
September 26, 2017 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Scheduling Conference held on 9/26/2017. Motions for Summary Judgment and Class Certification due by November 13, 2017. Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment and Class Certification due by December 4, 2017. Replies to Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment and Class Certification due by December 11, 2017. Scheduling Conference held on 9/26/2017. ( Motions due by 11/13/2017.) ( Response due by : 12/4/2017)., Replies due by 12/11/2017.). (Court Reporter Megan Hague.) (pll)
September 20, 2017 Filing 67 NOTICE OF HEARING : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2017 10:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. You may dial into the conference call as early as 10:25 AM EST. Call in number: 888-684-8852. When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136#. If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565#. Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. s/ Pam LourceyCourtroom Deputy Clerk The quality of the audio connection is compromised by the use of cell phones or speakerphones and counsel are requested not to use those devices during the call. (pll)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 36 MOTION TO DISMISS - The motion, as it relates to Defendants Governor Rick Scott, Attorney General Pam Bondi, Chief Financial Officer Jeff Atwater, and Commissioner of Agriculture Adam H. Putnam, is DENIED. The other defendants, who are not members of the Executive Clemency Board, are not responsible for the challenged scheme and thus the motion, as it relates to Defendants Ken Detzner, Julie L. Jones, Melinda N. Coonrod, Richard D. Davison, David A. Wyant, and Julia McCall, is GRANTED. The Clerk shall set this matter for a telephonic status conference to readdress the briefing schedule. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/19/2017. (vkm)
September 8, 2017 Reset Deadline Re: 21 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/10/2017. (vkm)
September 7, 2017 Filing 65 STATUS REPORT JOINT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING 63 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - The Clerk shall disconnect Ms. Baker from receipt of CM/ECF notices in this case. This Court notes that Plaintiffs are still represented by counsel. Attorney BRITTNIE R BAKER terminated. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/6/2017. (vkm)
September 6, 2017 Filing 63 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (BAKER, BRITTNIE)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL - Plaintiffs' motion to compel, ECF No. 51 , is DENIED. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/11/2017. (cle)
August 11, 2017 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Motion Hearing held on 8/11/2017 re 51 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Megan Hague.) (pll)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 58 MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER. (Dispositive Motions to be filed by 10/27/2017., Discovery due by 9/29/2017., Motions due by 10/27/2017.) Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/9/2017. (tdl)
August 8, 2017 Filing 59 STATUS REPORT Joint by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
August 7, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Modify Scheduling Order by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (BAKER, BRITTNIE)
August 7, 2017 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by JEFF ATWATER, PAM BONDI, JULIA MCCALL, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT. (NEFF, LANCE)
August 3, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE of Hearing on 51 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents : Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2017 11:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. You may dial into the conference call as early as 10:55 AM EST. Call in number: 888-684-8852. When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136#. If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565#. Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. s/ Pam LourceyCourtroom Deputy Clerk The quality of the audio connection is compromised by the use of cell phones or speakerphones and counsel are requested not to use those devices during the call. (pll)
August 1, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on 51 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents :Telephonic Motion Hearing reset for 8/12/2017 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. **Due to Counsel's complex schedule, this hearing has been reset to a time at which this Court routinely works.** You may dial into the conference call as early as 8:25 AM EST. Call in number: 888-684-8852. When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136#. If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565#. Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. s/ Pam LourceyCourtroom Deputy Clerk The quality of the audio connection is compromised by the use of cell phones or speakerphones and counsel are requested not to use those devices during the call. (pll)
August 1, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE of Unavailability by JEFF ATWATER, PAM BONDI, MELINDA N COONROD, RICHARD D DAVISON, KEN DETZNER, JULIE L JONES, JULIA MCCALL, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT, DAVID A WYANT re 53 Notice of Hearing on Motion,,, 52 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (PRATT, JORDAN)
July 27, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on 51 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents :Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2017 10:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. You may dial into the conference call as early as 9:55 AM EST. Call in number: 888-684-8852. When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136#. If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565#. Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. s/ Pam LourceyCourtroom Deputy Clerk The quality of the audio connection is compromised by the use of cell phones or speakerphones and counsel are requested not to use those devices during the call. (pll)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' 51 MOTION TO COMPEL - Defendants must file an expedited response to the motion on or before 8/7/2017. The Clerk shall set this matter for hearing after August 7, 2017. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/27/2017. (vkm)
July 26, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 51 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/9/2017). (vkm)
July 26, 2017 Filing 51 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
July 19, 2017 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JEFF ATWATER, PAM BONDI, MELINDA N COONROD, RICHARD D DAVISON, KEN DETZNER, JULIE L JONES, JULIA MCCALL, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT, DAVID A WYANT. (AGARWAL, AMIT)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXPAND WORD COUNT - Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Expand the Word Limit for Their Reply Memorandum, ECF No. 47 , is GRANTED. Defendants may file a reply up to 4,700 words in length. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/19/2017. (cle)
July 19, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by POORAD RAZAVI on behalf of All Plaintiffs (RAZAVI, POORAD)
July 18, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by JEFF ATWATER, PAM BONDI, MELINDA N COONROD, RICHARD D DAVISON, KEN DETZNER, JULIE L JONES, JULIA MCCALL, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT, DAVID A WYANT. (PRATT, JORDAN)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING 45 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS - Reply due by 7/19/2017. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/10/2017. (vkm)
July 10, 2017 Reset Deadline Re: 21 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/8/2017. (vkm)
July 7, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File re 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by PAM BONDI. (HARLE, DENISE)
July 7, 2017 Filing 44 STATUS REPORT Joint by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
July 5, 2017 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
July 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 41 LEAVE TO FILE LONGER MEMORANDUM. Plaintiffs may file a response up to 9,500 words in length. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/1/17. (pll)
June 30, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File a Longer Memorandum In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS. This Court has considered, without hearing, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. ECF No. 39 . The motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their response on or before 7/5/2017). Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/16/2017. (kjw)
June 15, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS re ECF No. 37 . The motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/14/2017. (tdl)
June 13, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay Discovery, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by JEFF ATWATER, PAM BONDI, MELINDA N COONROD, RICHARD D DAVISON, KEN DETZNER, JULIE L JONES, JULIA MCCALL, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT, DAVID A WYANT. (AGARWAL, AMIT)
June 13, 2017 Filing 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/27/2017).) by JEFF ATWATER, PAM BONDI, MELINDA N COONROD, RICHARD D DAVISON, KEN DETZNER, JULIE L JONES, JULIA MCCALL, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT, DAVID A WYANT. (AGARWAL, AMIT)
June 13, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by AMIT AGARWAL on behalf of All Defendants (AGARWAL, AMIT)
June 8, 2017 Filing 34 STATUS REPORT JOINT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
June 8, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by LANCE ERIC NEFF on behalf of JEFF ATWATER, PAM BONDI, MELINDA N COONROD, RICHARD D DAVISON, KEN DETZNER, JULIE L JONES, JULIA MCCALL, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT, DAVID A WYANT (NEFF, LANCE)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER re 31 Report: (Answer to Amended Complaint due by 6/13/2017., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 9/29/2017., Discovery due by 9/1/2017., Response in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification due by 10/20/2017., Motion for Class Certification due by 9/29/2017., Reply to Response in Opposition due by 10/27/2017.) Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/25/2017. (tdl)
May 19, 2017 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: 31 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (vkm)
May 18, 2017 Filing 31 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BAKER, BRITTNIE)
May 9, 2017 Rest Deadlines Re: 21 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 6/8/2017. (vkm)
May 8, 2017 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT JOINT by VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
April 27, 2017 Filing 29 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH, WILLIAM BASS, JAMES LARRY EXLINE, VIRGINIA KAY ATKINS. (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
April 12, 2017 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2017 re 24 MOTION to Extend TimeTo Respond. Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 24 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiffs Amended Complaint due on or before April 28, 2017. Defendants response due on or before June 13, 2017.( Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2017., Answer to Amended Complaint due by 6/13/2017.). (Court Reporter Megan Hague.) (pll)
April 10, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN E PRATT on behalf of All Defendants (PRATT, JORDAN)
April 6, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on 24 MOTION to Extend Time :Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2017 01:30 PM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. You may dial into the conference call as early as 1:25 PM EST. Call in number: 888-684-8852. When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136#. If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565#. Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. s/ Pam LourceyCourtroom Deputy Clerk The quality of the audio connection is compromised by the use of cell phones or speakerphones and counsel are requested not to use those devices during the call. (pll)
April 6, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM JORDAN JONES on behalf of KEN DETZNER (JONES, WILLIAM)
April 6, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION to Extend TimeTo Respond, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by JEFF ATWATER, PAM BONDI, MELINDA N COONROD, RICHARD D DAVISON, KEN DETZNER, JULIE L JONES, JULIA MCCALL, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT, DAVID A WYANT. (DAVIS, ASHLEY)
April 6, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID ANDREW FUGETT on behalf of KEN DETZNER (FUGETT, DAVID)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADMITTING JON SHERMAN PRO HAC VICE - This Court has considered, without hearing, Plaintiff' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. ECF No. 20 . Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED and JON SHERMAN is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/6/2017. (vkm)
April 6, 2017 Filing 21 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/22/2017. Discovery due by 8/4/2017. Status Report due by 5/8/2017. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/6/2017. (vkm)
April 6, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JON SHERMAN.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-3846652.) by WILLIAM BASS, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D.C. Court of Appeals Certificate of Good Standing - Jon Sherman) (SHERMAN, JONATHAN)
April 5, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E DAVIS on behalf of All Defendants (DAVIS, ASHLEY)
April 5, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN ALAN GLOGAU on behalf of All Defendants (GLOGAU, JONATHAN)
March 31, 2017 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH, WILLIAM BASS. PAM BONDI served on 3/27/2017, answer due 4/17/2017; JULIE L JONES served on 3/27/2017, answer due 4/17/2017; ADAM H PUTNAM served on 3/27/2017, answer due 4/17/2017; RICK SCOTT served on 3/27/2017, answer due 4/17/2017. (vkm)
March 31, 2017 Filing 16 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ATTORNEY DIANA MARTIN: Re 12 , 13 , 14 , & 15 Affidavits of Service - Counsel is advised by this entry, that Return of Service should be filed as Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. Please use the event selection "Summons Returned Executed" or "Summons Returned Unexecuted" which is found under "Initial Pleadings and Service" under "Service of Process" (vkm)
March 31, 2017 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Class Action Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Rick Scott on 03/27/2017, filed by WILLIAM BASS, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (MARTIN, DIANA)
March 31, 2017 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Class Action Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Adam Putnam on 03/27/2017, filed by WILLIAM BASS, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (MARTIN, DIANA)
March 31, 2017 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Class Action Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Pam Bondi on 03/27/2017, filed by WILLIAM BASS, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (MARTIN, DIANA)
March 31, 2017 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Class Action Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Julie Jones on 03/27/2017, filed by WILLIAM BASS, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (MARTIN, DIANA)
March 28, 2017 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH, WILLIAM BASS. JEFF ATWATER served on 3/21/2017, answer due 4/11/2017; MELINDA N COONROD served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017; RICHARD D DAVISON served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017; KEN DETZNER served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017; JULIA MCCALL served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017; DAVID A WYANT served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (vkm)
March 28, 2017 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Class Action Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on David A. Wyant on 03/22/2017, filed by WILLIAM BASS, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (MARTIN, DIANA)
March 28, 2017 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Class Action Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Ken Detzner on 03/22/2017, filed by WILLIAM BASS, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (MARTIN, DIANA)
March 28, 2017 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Class Action Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Richard D. Davison on 03/22/2017, filed by WILLIAM BASS, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (MARTIN, DIANA)
March 28, 2017 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Class Action Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Julia McCall on 03/22/2017, filed by WILLIAM BASS, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (MARTIN, DIANA)
March 28, 2017 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Class Action Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Melinda Coonrod on 03/22/2017, filed by WILLIAM BASS, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (MARTIN, DIANA)
March 28, 2017 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Class Action Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Jeff Atwater on 03/21/2017, filed by WILLIAM BASS, JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO, HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR, YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA, JAMES MICHAEL HAND, JERMAINE JOHNEKINS, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH. (MARTIN, DIANA)
March 15, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JEFF ATWATER, PAM BONDI, MELINDA N COONROD, RICHARD D DAVISON, KEN DETZNER, JULIE L JONES, JULIA MCCALL, ADAM H PUTNAM, RICK SCOTT, DAVID A WYANT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons (Bondi), # 2 Summons (Atwater), # 3 Summons (Detzner), # 4 Summons (Jones), # 5 Summons (Putnam), # 6 Summons (Coonrod), # 7 Summons (Wyant), # 8 Summons (Davison), # 9 Summons (McCall)) (vkm)
March 13, 2017 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ATTORNEY BRITTNIE BAKER: Re 1 Complaint - Counsel is advised that party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website). The party names will be corrected by the clerk. (vkm)
March 13, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BAKER, BRITTNIE)
March 13, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-3825751.), filed by Yraida Leonides Guanipa, Jospeh James Galasso, James Michael Hand, Jermaine Johnekins, Harold W. Gircsis, Jr, Christopher Michael Smith, William Bass. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for Rick Scott, # 2 Summons for Pam Bondi, # 3 Summons for Jeff Atwater, # 4 Summons for Adam Putnam, # 5 Summons for Ken Detzner, # 6 Summons for Julie Jones, # 7 Summons for Melinda Coonrod, # 8 Summons for David Wyant, # 9 Summons for Richard Davison, # 10 Summons for Julia McCall) (BAKER, BRITTNIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAND et al v. SCOTT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MICHAEL HAND
Represented By: BRITTNIE R BAKER
Represented By: THEODORE JON LEOPOLD
Represented By: DIANA L MARTIN
Represented By: JONATHAN LEE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH JAMES GALASSO
Represented By: BRITTNIE R BAKER
Represented By: THEODORE JON LEOPOLD
Represented By: DIANA L MARTIN
Represented By: JONATHAN LEE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD W GIRCSIS, JR
Represented By: BRITTNIE R BAKER
Represented By: THEODORE JON LEOPOLD
Represented By: DIANA L MARTIN
Represented By: JONATHAN LEE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH
Represented By: BRITTNIE R BAKER
Represented By: THEODORE JON LEOPOLD
Represented By: DIANA L MARTIN
Represented By: JONATHAN LEE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM BASS
Represented By: BRITTNIE R BAKER
Represented By: THEODORE JON LEOPOLD
Represented By: DIANA L MARTIN
Represented By: JONATHAN LEE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERMAINE JOHNEKINS
Represented By: BRITTNIE R BAKER
Represented By: THEODORE JON LEOPOLD
Represented By: DIANA L MARTIN
Represented By: JONATHAN LEE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YRAIDA LEONIDES GUANIPA
Represented By: BRITTNIE R BAKER
Represented By: THEODORE JON LEOPOLD
Represented By: DIANA L MARTIN
Represented By: JONATHAN LEE SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK SCOTT
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: JONATHAN ALAN GLOGAU
Represented By: JORDAN E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAM BONDI
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: JONATHAN ALAN GLOGAU
Represented By: JORDAN E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF ATWATER
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: JONATHAN ALAN GLOGAU
Represented By: JORDAN E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM H PUTNAM
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: JONATHAN ALAN GLOGAU
Represented By: JORDAN E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN DETZNER
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: DAVID ANDREW FUGETT
Represented By: JONATHAN ALAN GLOGAU
Represented By: WILLIAM JORDAN JONES
Represented By: JORDAN E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE L JONES
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: JONATHAN ALAN GLOGAU
Represented By: JORDAN E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELINDA N COONROD
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: JONATHAN ALAN GLOGAU
Represented By: JORDAN E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD D DAVISON
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: JONATHAN ALAN GLOGAU
Represented By: JORDAN E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID A WYANT
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: JONATHAN ALAN GLOGAU
Represented By: JORDAN E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIA MCCALL
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: JONATHAN ALAN GLOGAU
Represented By: JORDAN E PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?