ELLER et al v. STOETZEL et al

Plaintiff: KIRSTEN ELLER and DWAYNE ELLER
Defendant: M.D. RALPH SPENCER STOETZEL, III, NORTH FLORIDA SPORTS MEDICINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, P.A., NORTH FLORIDA SPORTS MEDICINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER PA and RALPH SPENCER STOETZEL, III
Case Number: 4:2018cv00443
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: #5 Order of Remand and certified copy of the docket sheet, sent to the Circuit Court for the 2nd Judicial District in and for Leon County, Florida. (cle)
October 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REMAND - re: #4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWING NOTICE OF REMOVAL. This case is remanded to the Circuit Court, Second Judicial Circuit, Leon County, Florida. The clerk must take all steps necessary to effect the remand. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/14/2018. (cle)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NORTH FLORIDA SPORTS MEDICINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER PA, RALPH SPENCER STOETZEL, III re #1 Notice of Removal,, (RAMSEY, RICHARD)
September 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 10/11/2018. (cle)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/26/18. (sms)
September 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadline - Check status of attorney admission for attorney Sean Lyons by 10/9/2018. (kjw)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE Regarding Electronic Filing and Attorney Admissions Requirement - Attorney Sean Lyons. (kjw) **Notice mailed to attorney at SEAN LYONS, ESQ, LYONS & LYONS, 126 VILLITA ST., SAN ANTONIO, TX 78205. **
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NORTH FLORIDA SPORTS MEDICINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, P.A., RALPH SPENCER STOETZEL, III from SECOND JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, IN AND FOR LEON COUNTY, FLORIDA, case number 2018-CA-1639. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4294799.), filed by NORTH FLORIDA SPORTS MEDICINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, P.A., RALPH SPENCER STOETZEL, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet) (RAMSEY, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELLER et al v. STOETZEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. RALPH SPENCER STOETZEL, III
Represented By: RICHARD EDWARD RAMSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH FLORIDA SPORTS MEDICINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, P.A.
Represented By: RICHARD EDWARD RAMSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH FLORIDA SPORTS MEDICINE AND ORTHOPEDIC CENTER PA
Represented By: RICHARD EDWARD RAMSEY
Represented By: CHARLENE CANAYNAY POBLETE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RALPH SPENCER STOETZEL, III
Represented By: RICHARD EDWARD RAMSEY
Represented By: CHARLENE CANAYNAY POBLETE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRSTEN ELLER
Represented By: RICHARD B COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DWAYNE ELLER
Represented By: RICHARD B COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?