PENTON v. CENTENNIAL BANK et al
Plaintiff: Simeon Penton
Defendant: GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, Overby-Seawell Company, CENTENNIAL BANK, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S OF LONDON and DOES 1-100
Case Number: 4:2018cv00450
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 34 STATUS REPORT (JOINT DISCOVERY) by SIMEON PENTON. (GUGLIELMO, JOSEPH)
November 28, 2018 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Inc. for GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.. (MAZA, JORGE)
November 28, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed re: #12 Initial Scheduling Order. The deadline to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement has expired. Great American Insurance Company has not filed it Disclosure Statement. (cle)
November 27, 2018 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S OF LONDON. (kjw)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AS MOOT - Plaintiff has filed his First Amended Class Action Complaint, ECF No. #30 . Accordingly, the pending motions to dismiss, ECF Nos. #10 and #13 , are denied as moot. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/21/2018. (cle)
November 20, 2018 Filing 30 First AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by SIMEON PENTON. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Lloyd's of London) (GILBERT, ROBERT)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADMITTING ERIN GREEN COMITE PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Erin Green Comite. ECF No. #28 . The motion is GRANTED. Ms. Comite has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/14/2018. (kjw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4332736.) by SIMEON PENTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (COMITE, ERIN)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS - Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss, ECF No. #22 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to the pending motions to dismiss, ECF Nos. #10 and #13 , on or before 11/20/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/8/2018. (cle)
November 8, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL EUGENE HARRELL on behalf of CENTENNIAL BANK (HARRELL, DANIEL)
November 8, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM E BOND on behalf of CENTENNIAL BANK (BOND, WILLIAM)
November 8, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES PHILLIP YOUNG on behalf of CENTENNIAL BANK (YOUNG, CHARLES)
November 8, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by TREVOR A THOMPSON on behalf of CENTENNIAL BANK (THOMPSON, TREVOR)
November 7, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions to Dismiss by SIMEON PENTON. (GUGLIELMO, JOSEPH)
November 6, 2018 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CENTENNIAL BANK identifying Corporate Parent HOME BANCSHARES, INC. for CENTENNIAL BANK.. (POWELL, ROBERT)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - Plaintiff's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Thomas K. Boardman, ECF No. #17 , is GRANTED. Mr. Boardman has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/2/2018. (cle)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - Plaintiff's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Margaret B. Ferron, ECF No. #18 , is GRANTED. Ms. Ferron has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/2/2018. (cle)
November 1, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4324299.) by SIMEON PENTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing) (FERRON, MARGARET)
November 1, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4324280.) by SIMEON PENTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing) (BOARDMAN, THOMAS)
October 31, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Class Action Complaint served on Gus Cuervo, Manager for Overy-Seawell Company on October 8, 2018, filed by SIMEON PENTON. (GILBERT, ROBERT)
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Class Action Complaint served on Shawna Galley, Legal Asst. for Great American Insurance Company on October 9, 2018, filed by SIMEON PENTON. (GILBERT, ROBERT)
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Class Action Complaint served on Kadeem Grant as employee of CT Corporation, Registered Agent on October 9, 2018, filed by SIMEON PENTON. (GILBERT, ROBERT)
October 31, 2018 Set Response Deadline as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/14/2018). (cle)
October 30, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CENTENNIAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage, #2 Exhibit Non-FPI Insurance Declarations, #3 Exhibit 2013 Appraisal) (POWELL, ROBERT)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/13/2018. Status Report due by 11/30/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/13/2018. Discovery due by 2/26/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/30/2018. (cle)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by OVERBY-SEAWELL COMPANY. (MCDONOUGH, SEAN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by OVERBY-SEAWELL COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/13/2018). (MCDONOUGH, SEAN)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Guglielmo has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for appearing pro hac vice. Accordingly, his motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/26/2018. (cle)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION and Consent Order to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (MAZA, JORGE)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph P. Guglielmo.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4319922.) by CENTENNIAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Service) (GUGLIELMO, JOSEPH)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to OVERBY-SEAWELL COMPANY. (cle)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (cle)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CENTENNIAL BANK. (cle)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cle)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: to Attorney Robert Gilbert - For future filings, Counsel is advised by this entry, that the Civil Cover Sheet is to be filed as a separate document from the Complaint. The Operations Specialist has extracted the Cover Sheet for you and has docketed it as a separate entry. (cle)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4301070.), filed by Simeon Penton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (Centennial Bank), #3 Summons (Great American Insurance Company), #4 Summons (Overby-Seawell Company)) (GILBERT, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENTON v. CENTENNIAL BANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simeon Penton
Represented By: ROBERT CECIL GILBERT
Represented By: ERIN GREEN COMITE
Represented By: THOMAS K BOARDMAN
Represented By: MARGARET B FERRON
Represented By: JOSEPH P GUGLIELMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JORGE A MAZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overby-Seawell Company
Represented By: SEAN MICHAEL MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTENNIAL BANK
Represented By: ROBERT JAMES POWELL
Represented By: DANIEL EUGENE HARRELL
Represented By: CHARLES PHILIP YOUNG
Represented By: WILLIAM E BOND
Represented By: TREVOR A THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS OF LLOYD'S OF LONDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?