SHELTON v. LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD et al
Plaintiff: STEPHEN SHELTON
Defendant: JAMES "'ROC HANNA, III, LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD and JAMES ROCKY HANNA, III
Case Number: 4:2018cv00487
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 RULE 26 Disclosures by JAMES ROCKY HANNA, III. (BOYD, WILLIAM)
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 RULE 26 Disclosures by LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD. (PLATT RADY, KAYLA)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 RULE 26 Disclosures by JAMES ROCKY HANNA, III. (BOYD, WILLIAM)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 RULE 26 Disclosures by JAMES ROCKY HANNA, III. (BOYD, WILLIAM)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER - re: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 6/14/2019. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 7/5/2019. Jury Trial set for 11/12/2019 at 8:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Case referred to mediation. Mediation Report due by 7/26/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/10/2018. (cle)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BOYD, WILLIAM)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS CO-COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS by JAMES ROCKY HANNA, III, LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD (MINNIS, DEBORAH)
December 3, 2018 Set Discovery Status Report Deadline - Status Report due by 1/3/2019. (cle)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Joint Discovery Status Report by STEPHEN SHELTON. (MATTHEW, SIDNEY)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by KAYLA ELIZABETH PLATT RADY on behalf of LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD (PLATT RADY, KAYLA)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/13/2018. Status Report due by 11/30/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/13/2018. Discovery due by 2/26/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/30/2018. (cle)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM TODD BOYD on behalf of JAMES ROCKY HANNA, III (BOYD, WILLIAM)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SMITH, NICOLE)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JAMES "'ROC HANNA, III, LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD from Circuit Court, Leon County, case number 2018-CA-002079. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4319918.), filed by JAMES "'ROC HANNA, III, LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (SMITH, NICOLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHELTON v. LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES "'ROC HANNA, III
Represented By: NICOLE SIEB SMITH
Represented By: YVETTE ROSE LAVELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD
Represented By: NICOLE SIEB SMITH
Represented By: KAYLA ELIZABETH PLATT RADY
Represented By: DEBORAH STEPHENS MINNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES ROCKY HANNA, III
Represented By: NICOLE SIEB SMITH
Represented By: YVETTE ROSE LAVELLE
Represented By: WILLIAM TODD BOYD
Represented By: DEBORAH STEPHENS MINNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN SHELTON
Represented By: RYAN BLAKE HOBBS
Represented By: SIDNEY LEWIS MATTHEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?