MCGROARTY v. SWEARINGEN

Plaintiff: Michael L McGroarty
Defendant: RICHARD L SWEARINGEN
Case Number: 4:2018cv00502
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MICHAEL L MCGROARTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Polygraph, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - E-mail, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - FDLE Flyer, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Letter) (FITZ, ANN)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Verified Complaint With Incorporated Memorandum of Law by RICHARD L SWEARINGEN. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/10/2019). (OLIVELLA, MIGUEL)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against RICHARD L SWEARINGEN, filed by MICHAEL L MCGROARTY. (FITZ, ANN)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL L MCGROARTY. RICHARD L SWEARINGEN waiver sent on 11/1/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (FITZ, ANN)
November 2, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Constitutional Challenge of Statute, #3 Civil Cover Sheet. (ckm)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ATTORNEY FITZ re #1 Complaint: The parties named in the above-referenced document were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. In addition, counsel is advised that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents." For future reference, please review the procedures for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide" (both available on the clerk's website) at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (Click on CM/ECF link and go to General Info.) (ckm)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ckm)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Constitutional Challenge of Statute by Michael L McGroarty re Rule 5.1(a) Notice (FITZ, ANN) Modified on 11/2/2018 to reflect document title (ckm).
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICHARD L SWEARINGEN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4324645.), filed by Michael L McGroarty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (FITZ, ANN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCGROARTY v. SWEARINGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L McGroarty
Represented By: ANN MARIE FITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD L SWEARINGEN
Represented By: MIGUEL A OLIVELLA, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?