WORTHEY v. STATE OF FLORIDA
Petitioner: DARRIUS L WORTHEY
Respondent: STATE OF FLORIDA
Case Number: 4:2018cv00509
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE TO 2254 PETITION - Petitioner's IFP motion (ECF No. #4 ) is DENIED as moot given his payment of the filing fee. The Clerk shall serve copies of the 2254 petition (ECF No. #1 ) and this order on Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Florida. Respondent shall file an answer, motion, or other response to the petition on or before 3/12/2019. Petitioner shall file a reply, if any, no later than 4/11/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 12/12/2018. (cle) *** Copies of this Order and the Petition sent to Florida AG and FDOC as directed. ***
December 11, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re: 5 Filing Fee Received. (cle)
December 10, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (cle)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 Filing Fee: $5.00, receipt number FLN4000355593. Fee status updated to paid. (cle)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by DARRIUS L WORTHEY. (cle)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Petitioner an application for leave to proceed IFP. Petitioner shall have until 12/7/2018, to either file an IFP application or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 11/7/2018. (cle) *** IFP Application sent to the Petitioner as directed. ***
November 5, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (cle)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DARRIUS L WORTHEY. (cle) *** No Service Copy provided. No Filing Fee paid or IFP filed. ***

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WORTHEY v. STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DARRIUS L WORTHEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?