DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA et al v. DETZNER
Plaintiff: DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA, BILL NELSON FOR U.S. SENATE and BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE
Defendant: KENNETH W DETZNER and ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA
Intervenor Defendant: NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE
Case Number: 4:2018cv00520
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
2 Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE - re: #86 MOTION to Hold Case in Abeyance and, in the Interim, Request to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleadings. The motion is GRANTED in part. The deadline for responsive pleadings is extended to 1/31/2019. This Court shall rule on the motion to hold case in abeyance by separate order. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/3/2019. (cle)
January 3, 2019 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #86 MOTION to Stay Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance and, in the Interim, Request to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleadings filed by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (NKWONTA, UZOMA)
January 2, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Stay Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance and, in the Interim, Request to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleadings by KENNETH W DETZNER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
December 12, 2018 Filing 85 USCA FRAP 11 REQUEST, re: USCA #18-14758-QQ. (*** USDC Clerk is requested to forward the following documents to our court: 1 packet of exhibits (see your FRAP 11 dated 11/19/18) ***) (kdm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE Secretary's Second Notice of Compliance with Supplemental Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction by KENNETH W DETZNER re #78 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - Defendant Secretary's Time Sensitive Motion for Time Extension, ECF No. #82 , is GRANTED. Because the requested relief in Defendant's most recent motion overlaps with Defendant Secretary of State Detzner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings in All Pending Cases, ECF No. #79 , that motion is DENIED as moot. Defendants' and Intervenors' shall file their responsive pleadings on or before 1/4/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/30/2018. (cle)
November 30, 2018 Filing 82 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Secretary's Time Sensitive Motion for Extension of Time Consistent with Court's Supplemental Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction by KENNETH W DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 30, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE Secretary's Notice of Compliance with Supplemental Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction by KENNETH W DETZNER re #78 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 29, 2018 Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Eleventh Circuit Transcript Information Form by KENNETH W DETZNER for proceedings held on 11/14/18 before Judge Mark E. Walker.. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 29, 2018 Filing 79 MOTION for Extension of Time to File SECRETARYS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS IN ALL PENDING CASES by KENNETH W DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SUPPLEMENT TO ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - re: #46 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Acknowledging the continued pendency of the appeal in this case, this Court assumes that the parties do not require further action from it at this time. The parties should provide notification on or before November 30, 2018, if this impression is in error. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/19/2018. (cle)
November 19, 2018 Filing 77 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Northern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal - re: #47 , #55 and #56 Notices of Appeal. USCA Appeal Number: 18-14758-Q. The record on appeal is available electronically with the exception of: One packet of exhibits. (cle)
November 16, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE OF UPDATED SIGNATURE MISMATCH NUMBERS by KENNETH W DETZNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Updated Mismatch Numbers) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 16, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Filing Transcript (Part III) by Court Reporter in District Court - re: #55 Notice of Appeal, #70 Transcript Acknowledgment - Part II, #62 Transcript Request Appeal Part I Court Reporter: Megan A. Hague Certificate of Readiness due by 11/15/2018. (mah)
November 16, 2018 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT Acknowledgment - Part II re #55 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter:Megan A. Hague Transcript due by 11/16/2018. (mah)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER of USCA as to #47 Notice of Appeal filed by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. Appellant's request for a stay pending appeal is DENIED because Appellant has not made the requisite showing. Appellant's alternative request to expedite appeal is DENIED. USCA Appeal Number: 18-14758-Q. (cle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 75 USCA Case Number 18-14758-Q is assigned to #56 NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by KENNETH W DETZNER. (cle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 74 USCA Case Number 18-14758-Q is assigned to #55 NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA. (cle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 73 USCA Case Number 18-14758-Q is assigned to #47 NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (cle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Proceedings held on 11/15/2018, before Judge Mark E. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan A. Hague, Telephone number 850-422-0011. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2019. (mah)
November 15, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE Secretary's Second Notice of Compliance by KENNETH W DETZNER re #46 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Directive 2018-05 - Cure of Mismatched-Signature Ballots) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 15, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE Secretary's Notice of Filing Updated List of Signature Mismatch Numbers by KENNETH W DETZNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Responses from County Supervisor of Elections) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 15, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary injunction Proceedings held on 11/14/2018, before Judge Mark Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan A. Hague, Telephone number 850-422-0011. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2019. (vkm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE Notice of Compliance by KENNETH W DETZNER re #46 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,, (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 15, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE SECRETARYS NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBIT REGARDING DISTRIBUTION OF COURTS ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by KENNETH W DETZNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email from Maria Matthews to Supervisors of Elections re Update DEC v. Detzner Order) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 15, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE Secretary's Notice of Filing Declaration of Maria Matthews by KENNETH W DETZNER (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 15, 2018 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE for proceedings held on 11/14/2018 before Judge Mark E. Walker, Court Reporter:Megan Hague (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 15, 2018 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2018 re #52 Emergency MOTION Requesting Order for Secretary to Issue List of Ballots Eliminated for Signature Match. Ruling by Court: Motion denied, Clerk to terminate motion (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (vkm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2018: #1 Exhibit Defense (Detzner) Exhibit 1) (vkm). (Main Document 61 replaced on 11/16/2018) (vkm). Modified on 11/16/2018 to include admitted exhibit (vkm).
November 15, 2018 Filing 60 Appeal Instructions - re: #56 Notice of Appeal. The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 11/29/2018. (cle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 59 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals - re: #56 Notice of Appeal. (cle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 58 Appeal Instructions - re: #55 Notice of Appeal. The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 11/29/2018. (cle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 57 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals - re: #55 Notice of Appeal. (cle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #46 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,, by KENNETH W DETZNER. ( Filing fee $505 Receipt Number AFLNDC-4335688.) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 15, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #46 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,, by ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA. ( Filing fee $505 Receipt Number AFLNDC-4335651.) (WENGER, EDWARD)
November 15, 2018 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 Emergency MOTION Requesting Order for Secretary to Issue List of Ballots Eliminated for Signature Match filed by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 15, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion Re #52 Emergency MOTION Requesting Order for Secretary to Issue List of Ballots Eliminated for Signature Match: Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:00 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. United States Courthouse, 111 North Adams Street, Tallahassee, FL 32301 NOTE: If any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as, a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Victoria Milton McGeeCourtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 52 Emergency MOTION Requesting Order for Secretary to Issue List of Ballots Eliminated for Signature Match by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (MEYER, RONALD)
November 15, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Filing Security for Temporary Injunction by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA re #46 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (MEYER, RONALD)
November 15, 2018 Filing 49 Appeal Instructions - re: #47 Notice of Appeal. The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 11/29/2018. (cle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 48 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals - re: #47 Notice of Appeal. (cle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #46 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,, by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. ( Filing fee $505 Receipt Number AFLNDC-4335188.) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #3 , is GRANTED. Defendant Detzner is ordered to issue a directive to the supervisors of elections (with this Order attached) advising them (1) Florida's statutory scheme as it relates to curing mismatched-signature ballots has been applied unconstitutionally; and (2) in light of this Court's order, they are required to allow voters who have been belatedly notified they have submitted a mismatched-signature ballot to cure their ballots by November 17, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. The supervisors of elections shall allow mismatched-signature ballots to be cured in the same manner and with the same proof a mismatched-signature ballot could have otherwise been cured before November 5, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. The preliminary injunction set out above will take effect upon the posting of security in the amount of $500 for costs and damages sustained by a party found to have been wrongfully enjoined. Plaintiffs will immediately notify Defendant when the bond has been posted and thereafter immediately file proof of such notice through the electronic case files system. Likewise, upon receipt of the notice of the posting of security, Defendant shall notify this Court whether he intends to comply with this Order by filing a notice through the electronic case files system on or before 5:00 P.M. on November 15, 2018. Defendants' motions to stay the preliminary injunction are DENIED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/15/2018. (kjw)
November 15, 2018 Set Appeal Status Deadline - re: #47 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 2/15/2019. Certificate of Readiness due by 2/15/2019. (cle)
November 15, 2018 Set Appeal Status Deadline - re: #56 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 2/15/2019. Certificate of Readiness due by 2/15/2019. (cle)
November 15, 2018 Set Appeal Status Deadline - re: #55 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 2/15/2019. Certificate of Readiness due by 2/15/2019. (cle)
November 14, 2018 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Evidentiary Hearing held on 11/14/2018. Court hears argument from both sides regarding the #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Order to follow (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) (vkm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2018: #2 Exhibit Defense Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Defense Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Defense Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Defense Exhibit 4) (vkm).
November 13, 2018 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT re #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, of Patrick Murphy by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ELIAS, MARC)
November 13, 2018 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT re #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, of Daniela Ferro by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (ELIAS, MARC)
November 13, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE ALLISON DANIEL on behalf of ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA (DANIEL, STEPHANIE)
November 13, 2018 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE - Subpoena served on Mark Early, Leon County Supervisor of Elections on 11/13/2018. (cle)
November 12, 2018 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE identifying Corporate Parent NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE for NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE.. (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 12, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDY V BARDOS on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 12, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDY V BARDOS on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/12/2018. (kjw)
November 12, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF CORRECTION by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE re #27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 12, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN E PRATT on behalf of ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA (PRATT, JORDAN)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY. Plaintiffs have filed an emergency motion for leave to file a reply, ECF No. #28 . The motion is GRANTED. This Court accepts and will consider the plaintiffs' proposed reply, ECF No. #28 -1. The pleadings are now closed. This Court will not accept or consider further briefing from the parties before the hearing on Wednesday, November 14, 2018 at 1:00 P.M. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/12/2018. (kjw) (Main Document 35 replaced on 11/12/2018) (kjw). Modified on 11/12/2018 to correct the hearing date. (kjw)
November 12, 2018 Filing 34 Subpoena Issued as to MARK EARLEY for 11/14/2018. (kjw)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF WITNESS SUBPOENA BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/12/2018. (kjw)
November 12, 2018 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT re #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, of Fallon Williams by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (ELIAS, MARC)
November 12, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Injection and Temporary Restraining Order filed by ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA. (WENGER, EDWARD)
November 12, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E ELIAS on behalf of BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA (ELIAS, MARC)
November 12, 2018 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, of Ezekiel Andreassen by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (ELIAS, MARC)
November 12, 2018 Filing 28 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Reply by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ELIAS, MARC)
November 12, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Injection and Temporary Restraining Order SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION filed by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING PROCEDURES FOR HEARING AND ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/11/2018. (kjw)
November 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER. Judge Hinkle disqualified himself from this case. ECF No. #21 . I have considered the previous scheduling order, ECF No. #20 , entered yesterday, November 9, 2018. I fully adopt that order. Accordingly, the parties are to strictly comply with the deadlines as set forth in ECF No. #20 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/10/2018. (kjw)
November 10, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing on #3 Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunction, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 01:00 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. United States Courthouse, 111 North Adams St., Tallahassee, Florida 32301. NOTE: If you or any party, witness, or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Victoria Milton McGee at 850-521-3501 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Kimberly WestphalDeputy Clerk (kjw)
November 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the following motions to appear pro hac vice, ECF Nos. #12 , #13 , #14 , and #17 . The motions are GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/10/2018. (kjw) *Attoroneys Helgi C. Walker, Thomas H. Dupree, Jr., and Uzoma Nkwonta to be admitted to FLND and added to the case. Attorney Jason Torchinsky is already admitted in FLND.
November 10, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Injection and Temporary Restraining Order filed by KENNETH W DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/10/18. (sms)
November 10, 2018 CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER added. JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE no longer assigned to case. (sms)
November 9, 2018 Set Deadlines re: #20 SCHEDULING ORDER. Response to #3 Emergency MOTION for preliminary Injunction due by noon on Monday, 11/12/2018. That deadline will not roll over to the next day even though November 12 is a federal holiday. A hearing on the motion for temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction is set for Wednesday, 11/14/2018 01:00 PM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. (kjw)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER (granting #11 Motion to Intervene; granting #15 Motion to Intervene). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/9/18. (RH)
November 9, 2018 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/9/2018. Parties discuss the pending motions and the schedule for responding to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ruling by Court: The Motions to Intervene are GRANTED. The deadline for response or further submissions on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is Monday, November 12, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. Oral Argument will be set for Wednesday, November 14, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. An order is forthcoming. (Court Reporter Judy Gagnon) (ckm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE re #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Injection and Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Injunction, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 9, 2018 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Uzoma Nkwonta.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4331695.) by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 9, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD M WENGER on behalf of ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA (WENGER, EDWARD)
November 9, 2018 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA. (WENGER, EDWARD)
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4331668.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (TORCHINSKY, JASON)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas H. Dupree, Jr..( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4331623.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Helgi C. Walker.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4331588.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2018 04:00 PM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 1114# For better sound quality, please mute your phone when you are not speaking. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E DAVIS on behalf of KENNETH W DETZNER (DAVIS, ASHLEY)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to KENNETH W DETZNER. (cle)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of KENNETH W DETZNER (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD G MEYER on behalf of BILL NELSON FOR U.S. SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA (MEYER, RONALD)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BILL NELSON FOR U.S. SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Injection and Temporary Restraining Order filed by BILL NELSON FOR U.S. SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Injection and Temporary Restraining Order by BILL NELSON FOR U.S. SENATE, DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KENNETH W DETZNER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4331117.), filed by DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA, BILL NELSON FOR U.S. SENATE. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (BLOHM, JENNIFER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA et al v. DETZNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM
Represented By: RONALD G MEYER
Represented By: MARC E ELIAS
Represented By: UZOMA NKEM NKWONTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILL NELSON FOR U.S. SENATE
Represented By: JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM
Represented By: RONALD G MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE
Represented By: JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM
Represented By: RONALD G MEYER
Represented By: MARC E ELIAS
Represented By: UZOMA NKEM NKWONTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH W DETZNER
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: MALCOLM NOBLE MEANS
Represented By: BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: JORDAN E PRATT
Represented By: BLAINE H WINSHIP
Represented By: EDWARD M WENGER
Represented By: STEPHANIE ALLISON DANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: HELGI C WALKER
Represented By: JASON BRETT TORCHINSKY
Represented By: GEORGE TY LEVESQUE
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?