DSCC et al v. ERTEL
Plaintiff: BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE and DSCC
Defendant: KENNETH W DETZNER and MICHAEL ERTEL
Intervenor Defendant: NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE
Intervenor: RON DESANTIS FOR GOVERNOR CAMPAIGN
Case Number: 4:2018cv00526
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY, re #50 NOTICE of Substitution of Party. It is ordered: The Clerk is directed to substitute Michael Ertel as the Defendant in place of Kenneth W. Detzner. The parties should list Michael Ertel as the Defendant in subsequent pleadings. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 01/09/2019. (rcb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Substitution of Party by KENNETH W DETZNER (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
January 4, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Withdrawal of William C. Marra by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (COOPER, CHARLES)
December 28, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings : Status Report due by 1/14/2019. (pll)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Secretary's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. ECF No. #47 . The motion is GRANTED. The Defendant and Defendant-Intervenor, National Republican Senatorial Committee, shall file their responsive pleadings on or before 1/31/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/20/2018. (kjw)
December 20, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Secretary's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings Until January 31, 2019 by KENNETH W DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified on 12/21/2018 to correct(rcb).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #45 : The deadline to conduct a Rule 26(f) conference and file a joint report is extended to 1/22/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/17/18. (amm)
December 14, 2018 Filing 45 STATUS REPORT and Consent Motion for Extension of Time by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DSCC. (NKWONTA, UZOMA)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING INTERVENOR'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW. This Court has considered, without hearing, The Ron DeSantis for Governor Campaign's unopposed motion to withdraw as intervenor. ECF No. #43 . This motion is GRANTED. The Clerk shall disconnect the notice of electronic filing for withdrawing counsel. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/6/2018. (kjw)
December 5, 2018 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw the RON DESANTIS FOR GOVERNOR CAMPAIGN as Intervenor. (HALL, WILLIAM) Modified on 12/6/2018 to reflect that this is an unopposed motion. (kjw)
December 4, 2018 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DSCC. (NKWONTA, UZOMA)
December 2, 2018 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. This Court has considered, without hearing, Defendant Secretary of State Detzner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings in All Pending Cases. ECF No. #39 . This motion is GRANTED IN PART, as it relates to this case. This Court directs Defendant and Intervenors to file responsive pleadings on or before 12/21/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/29/2018. (kjw)
November 29, 2018 Filing 39 Secretary's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings in All Pending Cases, filed by KENNETH W DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct document title. (kjw)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. This Court has considered, without hearing, Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's Supplemental Order. ECF No. #37 . This motion is GRANTED. The parties are directed to confer and file a notice indicating how they intend to proceed in this action on or before 12/14/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/29/2018. (kjw)
November 28, 2018 Filing 37 Plaintiffs' Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's #35 SUPPLEMENT TO ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DSCC. (NKWONTA, UZOMA) Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct document title. (kjw)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Discovery due by 3/14/2019. Status Report due by 12/20/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/3/2019. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/4/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/4/2018.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/20/2018. (ckm)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SUPPLEMENT TO ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: This Court directs the parties to confer and file indication of how they intend to proceed on or before 11/30/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/19/18. (amm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Proceedings held on 11/14/2018, before Judge Mark E. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan A. Hague, Telephone number 850-422-0011. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2019. (mah)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The #3 motion for a preliminary injunction, enjoining the use of the consistency and magic words rules as stated in Florida law, during a manual recount, is DENIED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/15/2018. (kjw)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Ron DeSantis for Governor Campaign's Emergency Motion to Intervene. ECF No. #30 . The motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/15/2018. (kjw)
November 15, 2018 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Ron DeSantis for Governor Campaign. (HALL, WILLIAM)
November 15, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Intervene by Ron DeSantis for Governor Campaign. (HALL, WILLIAM)
November 15, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY in Support of #3 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DSCC. (ELIAS, MARC) Modified on 11/15/2018 to reflect document title(ckm).
November 15, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E DAVIS on behalf of KENNETH W DETZNER (DAVIS, ASHLEY)
November 15, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause filed by KENNETH W DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 15, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause filed by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
November 14, 2018 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to KENNETH W DETZNER. (ckm)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADMITTING UZOMA N. NKWONTA PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Uzoma N. Nkwonta. ECF No. #22 . The motion is GRANTED. Mr. Nkwonta has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/14/2018. (kjw)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER PROVISIONALLY GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - The Emergency Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles J. Cooper, ECF No. #14 , Michael W. Kirk, ECF No. #15 , William C. Marra, ECF No. #16 , Davis Cooper, ECF No. #17 , and Joseph C. Masterman, ECF No. #18 . The motions are provisionally GRANTED. Mr. C. Cooper, Mr. Kirk, Mr. Marra, Mr. D. Cooper, and Mr. Masterman shall expeditiously complete the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and are provisionally admitted pro hac vice. The lawyers shall note they cannot be added to the electronic notification system by the Clerk until the admission requirements have been meet. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/14/2018. (cle)
November 14, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Uzoma N. Nkwonta.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4334245.) by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DSCC. (NKWONTA, UZOMA)
November 14, 2018 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Motion for Temp Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause; Memorandum of Law in Support of Emer Motion for Temp Restraining Order and Prel Injunc, Certificate of Compliance, Proposed Order, Notice of Appearances - Elias, Meyer and Blohm Vause's Process Service served on Detzner, Kenneth on 11/14/2018, filed by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DSCC. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 14, 2018 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Status Conference held on 11/14/2018. Ruling by Court: Charles Cooper's ore tenus motion to appear pro hac vice is granted. Defendant's response to motion for preliminary injunction due by 9:00 a.m. on 11/15/2018. Plaintiff's reply due by 11:00 a.m. on 11/15/2018 (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (vkm)
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of KENNETH W DETZNER (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 14, 2018 Filing 18 Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph O. Masterman.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4333736.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Davis Cooper.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4333734.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 14, 2018 Filing 16 Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William C. Marra.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4333733.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 14, 2018 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael W. Kirk.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4333724.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 14, 2018 Filing 14 Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles J. Cooper.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4333715.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 14, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON BRETT TORCHINSKY on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (TORCHINSKY, JASON)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/13/2018. Counsel for the intervenor shall appear at the telephonic hearing set for November 14, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (kdm)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE TY LEVESQUE on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/14/2018 11:00 AM EDT before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is comprised by these devices. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Victoria Milton McGee Courtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)***NEF PROVIDED TO MR. JAZIL***
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO SET STATUS CONFERENCE (Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/14/2018 11:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Clerk shall ensure that Mohammad Omar Jazil, counsel for Defendant, receives electronic notice of the hearing. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/13/2018. (vkm)***NEF EMAILED TO MR. JAZIL***
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD G MEYER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MEYER, RONALD)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM on behalf of BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DSCC (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. I disqualify myself from this case. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/13/2018. (kjw) *Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE no longer assigned to case. Please use the new judge's initials for future filings: 4:18cv526-MW/MJF.
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E ELIAS on behalf of Bill Nelson for U.S. Senate, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE (ELIAS, MARC)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause by Bill Nelson for U.S. Senate, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (ELIAS, MARC)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ELIAS, MARC)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KENNETH W DETZNER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4332733.), filed by DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE, Bill Nelson for U.S. Senate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons) (ELIAS, MARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DSCC et al v. ERTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE
Represented By: RONALD G MEYER
Represented By: MARC E ELIAS
Represented By: JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM
Represented By: UZOMA NKEM NKWONTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSCC
Represented By: RONALD G MEYER
Represented By: MARC E ELIAS
Represented By: JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM
Represented By: UZOMA NKEM NKWONTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH W DETZNER
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY
Represented By: MALCOLM NOBLE MEANS
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: DWAYNE KENT SAFRIET
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL ERTEL
Represented By: MALCOLM NOBLE MEANS
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY
Represented By: DWAYNE KENT SAFRIET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: GEORGE TY LEVESQUE
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Represented By: JASON BRETT TORCHINSKY
Represented By: CHARLES JUSTIN COOPER
Represented By: DAVIS COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: RON DESANTIS FOR GOVERNOR CAMPAIGN
Represented By: DANIEL RYAN RUSSELL
Represented By: WILLIAM DEAN HALL, III
Represented By: MARC WESLEY DUNBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?