STOPLER v. NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda Stopler
Defendant: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC and GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2018cv00558
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 8:18-cv-03028, filed 12/17/2018. (kjw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 Interdistrict Transfer to the Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division, located at 801 N. Florida Ave., Tampa, FL 33602. (kjw)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The motion to transfer, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to take all necessary steps to effectuate the transfer of this case to the Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division. Upon transfer, the Clerk is directed to close this case in the Northern District of Florida, Tallahassee Division. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/17/2018. (kjw)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Change Venue Unopposed and Memorandum in Support by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (HOSLEY, FRANK)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/20/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/22/2019. Discovery due by 4/5/2019. Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/6/2018. (kjw)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Regarding Electronic Filing and Attorney Admissions Requirement - ATTORNEY JOSHUA D MOORE. (kjw)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC. (HOSLEY, FRANK)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC identifying Corporate Parent NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD for NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC.. (HOSLEY, FRANK)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HOSLEY, FRANK)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC from Circuit Court of the Second Judicial Circuit in and for Leon County, Florida, case number 2018-CA-002370. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4350079.), filed by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (HOSLEY, FRANK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STOPLER v. NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Stopler
Represented By: BRANDEN WEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC
Represented By: FRANK DAVID HOSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?