HARRELL v. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON

Plaintiff: BRANDY NICOLE HARRELL
Defendant: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Case Number: 4:2018cv00562
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON identifying Corporate Parent LINCOLN NATIONAL CORPORATION, Corporate Parent THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY for LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON, LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON.. (MARCUS, LEE)
February 14, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/5/2019. Corporate Disclosure Statement not filed. (amm)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by BRANDY NICOLE HARRELL. (LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 1/22/19. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/5/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/7/2019. Discovery due by 5/14/2019. (amm)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ALL COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that for all future pleadings, for this case and any future cases assigned to Judge Hinkle, any exhibit attached to a document filing should be properly identified. (Example: Deposition of John Doe rather than Exhibit A.) Also note that ECF No #7 has the incorrect case number listed on the pleading. (amm)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against BRANDY NICOLE HARRELL by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (MARCUS, LEE)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (amm)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE Summons to Be Issued by BRANDY NICOLE HARRELL (LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL #3 . Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/12/18. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis (amm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BRANDY NICOLE HARRELL. *Note to Counsel - for future cases the motion to proceed in forma pauperis should be filed as a separate document not an attachment to the complaint. (amm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. *Note to Counsel - for future cases the civil cover sheet should be filed as a separate document not an attachment to the complaint. (amm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON, filed by BRANDY NICOLE HARRELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) (LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRELL v. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Represented By: LEE WARREN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDY NICOLE HARRELL
Represented By: MATTHEW DAVID LIEBENHAUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?