JULES v. WHITAKER
Petitioner: JEAN JULES
Respondent: UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL and MATTHEW G. WHITAKER
Case Number: 4:2018cv00568
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
2 Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW G. WHITAKER. (toy)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Petitioners motion for the appointment of counsel, ECF No. #14 , is DENIED without prejudice.The Clerk of Court shall substitute Acting United States Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker in place of named Respondent Jeff Sessions.The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons to Acting Attorney General ofthe United States Matthew G. Whitaker.The Clerk of Court shall also prepare a copy of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons, and send those copies to the United States Attorney for this District who shall have until March 25, 2019, in which to file an answer or similar response to the petition.Petitioner shall have until April 22, 2019, in which to file a reply to the answer or response filed by the Respondent.The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the filing of an answer or other response to the petition, or no later than March 25, 2019. MATTHEW G. WHITAKER answer due 3/25/2019.( Notify Chambers on 3/25/2019., Answer due by 3/25/2019., (Internal deadline for referral to judge if reply not filed earlier: 4/22/2019).). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 01/23/2019. ***Copies provided as noted in order (toy)
January 18, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #13 Response. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (toy)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 PETITIONER'S MOTION REQUESTING FOR APPOINTMENT OF IMMIGRATION COUNSELOR by JEAN JULES. (toy)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO THE #10 COURT ORDER FOR CLARIFICATION by JEAN JULES (toy)
December 28, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Request for Form. (ckm)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Form by JEAN JULES. (ckm)
December 26, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #11 Notice. (kjw)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 Notice - Pertaining to Case # 1-18-cv-25159-CMA That Was Transferred to This Northern District From Southern District Pursuant to 28 USC Section 2241. And the Government's Failure to Provide Petitioner Certified Copy of They Response as Required by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rules of the Courts filed by JEAN JULES. (kjw)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Petitioner must file a response to this Order no later than 1/18/2019. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Petitioner's response to this Order or no later than 1/18/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 12/18/2018. (kjw)
December 17, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (sdw)
December 17, 2018 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR no longer assigned to case. (sdw)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The clerk of court shall reassign this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge who is referred habeas corpus-alien detainee cases (NOS 463). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 12/17/2018. (sdw)
December 12, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (no filing fee/IFP motion) (sdw)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-25159. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; Adopting #6 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling Motions terminated: #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jean Jules Recommending T.. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/12/2018.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jean Jules; Recommending that this petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 be TRANSFERRED to the proper venue, which is the Northern District of Florida. Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 12/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/12/2018.]
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DIRECTIONS of filing the Corrections Offender Network / Offender Search to be made part of the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 12/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrections Offender Network) (fbn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/12/2018.]
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/12/2018.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jean Jules. Responses due by 12/21/2018. (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/12/2018.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/12/2018.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00, Not Paid/No IFP, filed by Jean Jules. (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JULES v. WHITAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JEAN JULES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?