SNIPES v. SCOTT et al

Plaintiff: DR BRENDA C SNIPES and BRENDA C SNIPES
Defendant: RICK L SCOTT, BILL GALVANO and RON DESANTIS
Case Number: 4:2018cv00580
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REFUND SECURITY BOND. This Court has considered Plaintiff's motion to refund security bond. ECF No. #38 . The motion is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to take all necessary steps to facilitate the refund of Plaintiff's posted security bond in the amount of $100.00. The case shall remain closed. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/25/2019. (kjw)
January 24, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Release of Funds Release of $100.00 Security Bond by BRENDA C SNIPES. (NORRIS-WEEKS, BURNADETTE)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED as moot. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/23/2019. (cle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF STATUS UPDATE by BRENDA C SNIPES re #34 Order,, Set Deadlines, (NORRIS-WEEKS, BURNADETTE)
January 22, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE by RICK L SCOTT re #34 Order,, Set Deadlines, Defendants' Suggestion of Mootness. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executive Order 19-18) (PRIMROSE, NICHOLAS)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO UPDATE COURT - The parties are directed to update this Court on or before Wednesday, 1/23/2019, whether the dispute is now moot and should be dismissed. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/22/2019. (cle)
January 14, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 1/7/2019, before Judge Mark E. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan A. Hague, Telephone number 850-443-9797. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2019. (mah)
January 11, 2019 Filing 32 Security BOND in the amount of $ 100.00 posted by BRENDA C SNIPES. Receipt number FLN400035833. (cle)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - This Court has considered, without hearing, the Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by the Governor. ECF No. #30 . The motion is GRANTED. As agreed by the parties, both Defendants may file their responsive pleadings to the Amended Complaint on or before 1/22/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/11/2019. (vkm)
January 11, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by RICK L SCOTT. (PRIMROSE, NICHOLAS)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - Plaintiff Brenda Snipes' motion for preliminary injunction, ECF No. #15 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is GRANTED insofar as Snipes is entitled to notice and a meaningful opportunity to be heard as outlined above. Defendant DeSantis is preliminarily enjoined to afford Snipes notice and a meaningful opportunity to be heard as outlined above. It is DENIED in all other respects. The preliminary injunction set out above will take effect upon the posting of security in the amount of $100 for costs and damages sustained by a party found to have been wrongfully enjoined. Upon receipt of the notice of the posting of security, Defendant DeSantis shall submit a notice of compliance with this Court on or before the day Snipes is given notice and on or before the day Snipes is given a meaningful opportunity to be heard. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/10/2019. (cle)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/23/2019. Status Report due by 2/11/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/22/2019. Discovery due by 5/9/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/9/2019. (cle)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #15 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/9/2019. (erl)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, ECF No. #18 , is DENIED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/9/2019. (cle)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - The Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Governor Scott, ECF No. #24 , is GRANTED. Daniel E. Nordby and Meredith L. Sasso are permitted to withdraw as counsel. The Clerk shall disconnect the notice of electronic filing for withdrawing counsel. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/8/2019. (cle)
January 7, 2019 Filing 24 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by RICK L SCOTT. (SASSO, MEREDITH)
January 7, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2019 re #15 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Court hears argument regarding #15 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ruling by Court: Defendant Scott to file response to #18 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by 1/11/2019. Order to follow (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (vkm)
January 4, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by BILL GALVANO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-Mail Regarding Count II) (HAWKES, JEREMIAH)
January 4, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RICK L SCOTT. (SASSO, MEREDITH)
January 4, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BILL GALVANO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Appointment, #2 Exhibit Oath of Office) (HAWKES, JEREMIAH)
January 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE AUSTIN PAMIES on behalf of BRENDA C SNIPES (PAMIES, MICHELLE)
January 4, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by BRENDA C SNIPES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Composite 5, #6 Exhibit Composite 6) (NORRIS-WEEKS, BURNADETTE)
December 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY ANN ISTLER on behalf of BILL GALVANO (ISTLER, ASHLEY)
December 24, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BRENDA C SNIPES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Order Granting Summary Judgment (Reams v Scott)) (NORRIS-WEEKS, BURNADETTE)
December 24, 2018 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BRENDA C SNIPES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Resignation Letter from Dr. Brenda C. Snipes, #2 Exhibit 2 Dr. Brenda C. Snipes Emergency Motion to Stay, #3 Exhibit 3 Email from Burnadette Norris-Weeks, #4 Exhibit 4 Governor Scott's Executive Order #18-342, #5 Exhibit 5 Affidavit of Mindy Perkins CEO, VR Systems, #6 Exhibit 6 Email to Governor Scott Re: Rescinded Resignation, #7 Exhibit 7 Memorandum from Sen. Galvano and Jeremiah M. Hawkes, #8 Exhibit 8 Declaration of Dr. Brenda C.Snipes) (NORRIS-WEEKS, BURNADETTE)
December 24, 2018 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED EMERGENCY COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants filed by BRENDA C SNIPES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Resignation Letter from Dr. Brenda C. Snipes, #2 Exhibit 2 Dr. Brenda C. Snipes Emergency Motion to Stay, #3 Exhibit 3 Email from Burnadette Norris-Weeks, #4 Exhibit 4 Governor Scott's Executive Order #18-342, #5 Exhibit 5 Affidavit of Mindy Perkins CEO, VR Systems, #6 Exhibit 6 Email to Governor Scott Re: Rescinded Resignation, #7 Exhibit 7 Memorandum from Sen. Galvano and Jeremiah M. Hawkes) (NORRIS-WEEKS, BURNADETTE)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/7/2019 01:00 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. United States Courthouse, 111 North Adams St., Tallahassee, Florida 32301. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as, a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Victoria Milton McGee at 850-521-3510 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Victoria Milton McGeeCourtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER:Scheduling Conference held on 12/20/2018. Parties discuss status of case. Ruling by Court: Plaintiff's motions and declarations due 12/24/2018. Defendants' responses and declarations due by 6:00 p.m. on 1/4/2019. Order argument regarding preliminary injunction scheduled for 1:00 p.m. on 1/7/2019. Defendants' answer to complaint due by 1/14/2019 (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (vkm)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MEREDITH SASSO on behalf of RICK L SCOTT (SASSO, MEREDITH)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMIAH MAHLON HAWKES on behalf of BILL GALVANO (HAWKES, JEREMIAH)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRENDA C SNIPES. BILL GALVANO served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (NORRIS-WEEKS, BURNADETTE)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRENDA C SNIPES. RICK L SCOTT served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (NORRIS-WEEKS, BURNADETTE)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to BILL GALVANO. (cle)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to RICK L SCOTT. (cle)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2018 03:30 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is comprised by these devices. s/ Victoria Milton McGeeCourtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Clerk shall set a telephonic scheduling conference for the motion for preliminary injunction, ECF No. #1 , for Thursday, December 20, 2018, at 3:30 p.m. Plaintiff shall ensure that Defendants are served with a copy of this order and the Emergency Complaint for Declaratory and Injunction Relief, ECF No. [1,] by Tuesday, December 18, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. and file proof of service on or before Wednesday, December 19, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/18/2018. (cle)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE OF STATUTE by BRENDA C SNIPES (Attachments: #1 Letter to Florida Attorney General Pam Bondi) (NORRIS-WEEKS, BURNADETTE)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (NORRIS-WEEKS, BURNADETTE)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT DR. BRENDA C. SNIPES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4359890.), filed by BRENDA C SNIPES. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Scott, #2 Summons - Galvano, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7) (NORRIS-WEEKS, BURNADETTE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNIPES v. SCOTT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK L SCOTT
Represented By: JOHN JEREMY MACIVER
Represented By: DANIEL ELDEN NORDBY
Represented By: NICHOLAS ALLEN PRIMROSE
Represented By: MEREDITH SASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL GALVANO
Represented By: ASHLEY ANN ISTLER
Represented By: JEREMIAH MAHLON HAWKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON DESANTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR BRENDA C SNIPES
Represented By: BURNADETTE NORRIS-WEEKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA C SNIPES
Represented By: BURNADETTE NORRIS-WEEKS
Represented By: MICHELLE AUSTIN PAMIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?