MUY v. INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION et al

Plaintiff: mailin muy
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION and TWC Product and Technology LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00014
Filed: January 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
0 Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
1 Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen A. Broome.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4423624.) by INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION, TWC PRODUCT AND TECHNOLOGY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (BAJOCZKY, ANTHONY)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. This Court has considered, without hearing, Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time. ECF No. #13 . The motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading to the Complaint on or before March 20, 2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/5/19. (blb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION, TWC PRODUCT AND TECHNOLOGY LLC. (BAJOCZKY, ANTHONY)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAILIN MUY. TWC PRODUCT AND TECHNOLOGY LLC served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (HOBBS, RYAN)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAILIN MUY. INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (HOBBS, RYAN)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to TWC PRODUCT AND TECHNOLOGY LLC. (blb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by MAILIN MUY (HOBBS, RYAN)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 **Please disregard - duplicate entry of #6 Summons.**Summons Issued as to INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION. (kjw) Modified on 1/17/2019 (kjw).
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number FLN400035850. Fee status updated to paid. (blb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION. (blb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE - Request for Summons for INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION filed by MAILIN MUY (HOBBS, RYAN) Modified on 1/17/2019 to correct docket text. (kjw)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HOBBS, RYAN)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Complaint filed by MAILIN MUY. The parties named in the above-referenced document were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. For future reference : Please review the procedures for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide" (both available on the clerk's website) at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (Click on CM/ECF link and go to General Info.) (blb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Complaint filed by MAILIN MUY. Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Further, for future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website). (blb)
January 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400.), filed by mailin muy. (ARMSTRONG, NICHOLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MUY v. INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: mailin muy
Represented By: NICHOLAS WILLIAM ARMSTRONG
Represented By: RYAN BLAKE HOBBS
Represented By: OSCAR MONFORT PRICE, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION
Represented By: JAMES P JUDKINS
Represented By: DOUGLAS LAMAR KILBY
Represented By: ANTHONY LEE BAJOCZKY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWC Product and Technology LLC
Represented By: JAMES P JUDKINS
Represented By: DOUGLAS LAMAR KILBY
Represented By: ANTHONY LEE BAJOCZKY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?