FOUSHEE v. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Plaintiff: BRENDA FOUSHEE
Defendant: GEICO INGEMNITY COMPANY and GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2019cv00056
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting :( Discovery due by 8/9/2019., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/30/2019., Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER., Mediation to take place by 9/6/2019., Mediation Report due by 9/20/2019.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 03/21/2019. (rcb)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 26 Disclosures by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (MOODY, THOMAS)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT FOR PARTIES PLANNING CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ALTERNATIVE DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING DEADLINES. (MOODY, THOMAS) Modified on 3/22/2019 to correct docket text. (kjw)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 26 Disclosures by BRENDA FOUSHEE. (CUNNINGHAM, FRED)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent GEICO CORPORATION for GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY.. (PALMER, BRENTT)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER.Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 02/21/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/7/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/8/2019. Discovery due by 6/21/2019. Status Report due by 3/25/2019. (rcb)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (PALMER, BRENTT)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS JAMES MOODY on behalf of GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY (MOODY, THOMAS)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM A DUKE on behalf of GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY (DUKE, ADAM)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by BRENTT EARL PALMER on behalf of GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY (PALMER, BRENTT)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Pionne Corbin for Geico Indemnity Company on 02/06/2019, filed by BRENDA FOUSHEE. (CUNNINGHAM, FRED)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (kjw)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (CUNNINGHAM, FRED)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GEICO INGEMNITY COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4388810.), filed by BRENDA FOUSHEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 SUMMONS) (CUNNINGHAM, FRED)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOUSHEE v. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA FOUSHEE
Represented By: FRED A CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INGEMNITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: ADAM A DUKE
Represented By: BRENTT EARL PALMER
Represented By: THOMAS JAMES MOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?