KEENAN v. JONES et al

Plaintiff: GEORGE W KEENAN
Defendant: BETH CABELL, ARMOR CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES, HAROLD W CLARKE, JULIE L JONES, AMONETTE, A DAVID ROBINSON, CHARLES CAMPBELL and CRYSTAL ALLEN
Case Number: 4:2019cv00081
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings Fee due by 4/19/2019. (blb)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #4 , is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiff is not required to prepay the $350.00 filing fee. Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $50.00 based on the monthly deposits in Plaintiff's Monthly Trust Account for the preceding six months as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A). Plaintiff has until 4/19/2019, to submit the initial partial filing fee. Failure to submit the assessed initial partial filing fee will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this action. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon payment of theassessed initial partial filing fee, or no later than 4/19/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 3/18/19. (blb)
March 7, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (blb)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GEORGE W KEENAN. (blb)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff an application packet for requesting in forma pauperis status. Plaintiff has until 3/12/2019, to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order or no later than March 12, 2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/11/19. *Form mailed as directed. (amm)
February 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. No service copies provided or IFP motion filed. (amm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (amm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by GEORGE W KEENAN. (No service copies provided) (amm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEENAN v. JONES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE W KEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETH CABELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMOR CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAROLD W CLARKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE L JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMONETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A DAVID ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRYSTAL ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?