RALPH v. BARR et al
Petitioner: MOSES LIDEN RALPH
Respondent: KRISTJEN NIELSON, MATTHEW WHITAKER, RONALD D VITIELLO and WILLIAM P BARR
Case Number: 4:2019cv00153
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re: #6 Response to Habeas Petition. (cle)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by WILLIAM P BARR, RONALD D VITIELLO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Babbit Declaration, #2 Affidavit Denton Declaration, #3 Exhibit Immigration Order) (REGISTER, LENNARD)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM P BARR, U.S. Attorney General, RONALD D VITIELLO, Acting Director of ICE, and U.S. Attorney. (cle)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED, and Petitioner is not required to pay the filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall substitute ICE Acting Director Ronald D. Vitiello in place of named Respondent, former Secretary Kirstjen Nielson. The Clerk of Court shall substitute the current United States Attorney General William P. Barr in place of Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, the former Attorney General. The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons to Attorney General of the United States William P. Barr and ICE Acting Director Ronald D. Vitiello. The Clerk of Court shall also prepare a copy of this Order, the petition, ECF No. [1,] and summons, and send those copies to the United States Attorney for this District who shall have until 6/14/2019, in which to file an answer or similar response to the petition which shows good cause as to why the relief sought by Petitioner should not be granted. Petitioner shall have until 7/12/2019, in which to file a reply to the answer or response filed by Respondents. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the filing of an answer or other response to the petition, or no later than 6/14/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 4/15/2019. (cle) *** All paperwork prepared and sent to Barr and Vitiello via mail. USA paperwork put in their box. ***
April 9, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (cle)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MOSES LIDEN RALPH. (cle)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MOSES LIDEN RALPH. (cle) *** One Service Copy provided. ***

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RALPH v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MOSES LIDEN RALPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KRISTJEN NIELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW WHITAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P BARR
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?