MATHIS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff: GRACE MATHIS
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00178
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/15/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/14/2019. Discovery due by 10/29/2019. Status Report due by 8/1/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/01/2019. (toy)
June 30, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (FISHER, PETER)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HINKLE, DONALD)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Grace Mathis as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald Mathis against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4468953.), filed by Grace Mathis, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald Mathis. (HINKLE, DONALD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATHIS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACE MATHIS
Represented By: DONALD M HINKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: PETER GUNNAR FISHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?