HALLMARK v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: SALLIE HALLMARK
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2019cv00187
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Set Deadline: Mediation Report due by 1/6/2019. (blb)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting : Discovery due by 12/9/2019, Dispositive Motions to be filed by 12/30/2019, Mediation Report Deadline 1/6/20, Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/17/19. (blb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (FOSTER, MATTHEW) Modified on 6/6/2019 (blb). *Edit Title*
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ABATING COUNT 2. The defendant's motion to dismiss, ECF No. #3 -1, is denied. All proceedings on count 2 are abated until otherwise ordered. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/28/19. (blb)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/13/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/12/2019. Discovery due by 8/26/2019. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 4/29/2019. (cle)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BOWEN, JESSICA)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT DOCS by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (BOWEN, JESSICA)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BOWEN, JESSICA)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY from Second Judicial Circuit Ct - Leon County, case number 2019 CA 0672. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4470838.), filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (BOWEN, JESSICA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALLMARK v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALLIE HALLMARK
Represented By: MATTHEW K FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JESSICA M BOWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?