MENGESHA v. BARR et al
Petitioner: KIDANE B MENGESHA
Respondent: YESEIRA DIAZ, WILLLIAM BARR, KEVIN MCALEENAN, WILLIAM BARR and MARK A MORGAN
Case Number: 4:2019cv00258
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (toy)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by WILLIAM BARR, YESEIRA DIAZ, KEVIN MCALEENAN, MARK A MORGAN. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/9/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Supervision, #2 Exhibit Form I-830) (REGISTER, LENNARD)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LENNARD B REGISTER, III on behalf of WILLIAM BARR, YESEIRA DIAZ, MARK A MORGAN (REGISTER, LENNARD)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM BARR, MARK A MORGAN - US ATTORNEY. *Forms prepared/Copies distributed as directed* (toy)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall substitute ICE Acting Director Mark A. Morgan in place of named Respondent Secretary Kevin McAleenan pursuant to Rule 25(d). The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons to Attorney General of the United States William Barr and ICE Acting Director Mark A. Morgan. The Clerk of Court shall also prepare a copy of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons, and send those copies to the United States Attorney for this District who shall have until August 6, 2019, in which to file an answer or similar response to the petition. Petitioner shall have until September 4, 2019, in which to file a reply to the answer or response filed by the Respondents. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the filing of an answer or other response to the petition, or no later than August 6, 2019. ( Notify Chambers on 8/6/2019., US Attorney Answer/Response due by 8/6 /2019., Petitioner Reply due by 9/4/2019.), MARK A MORGAN added. KEVIN MCALEENAN (SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY) terminated. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 06/07/2019. (toy) *Forms prepared and provided as instructed*
June 6, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (toy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (toy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number FLN400036886. Fee status updated to paid. (toy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by KIDANE B MENGESHA. (No service copies) (toy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENGESHA v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: YESEIRA DIAZ
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARK A MORGAN
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KIDANE B MENGESHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?