HARVELL v. FERRELLGAS INC
Plaintiff: JENNIFER HARVELL
Defendant: FERRELLGAS, INC. and FERRELLGAS INC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00264
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Corrected Document [DOC #12] In Place of the Document Filed in Error [DOC #11] by JENNIFER HARVELL re #12 Notice (Other) (MATTOX, MARIE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Statement of Compliance With Rule 26 by JENNIFER HARVELL (MATTOX, MARIE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 **please disregard - filed in error** NOTICE of Plaintiff's Statement of Compliance With Rule 26 by JENNIFER HARVELL (MATTOX, MARIE) Modified on 7/16/2019 at the request of the attorney. (kjw)
July 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/12/2019. (blb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT JOINT DISCOVERY STATUS REPORT by JENNIFER HARVELL. (GOODMAN, ERIKA)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting :( Discovery due by 2/14/2020., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/6/2020., Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER., Mediation Report due by 3/27/2020.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/27/19. (blb)
June 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (blb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SHARKEY, BENJAMIN)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN LEE HAYDEN on behalf of FERRELLGAS INC (HAYDEN, BRIAN)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GOODMAN, ERIKA)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by FERRELLGAS INC. (SHARKEY, BENJAMIN)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by FERRELLGAS INC. (SHARKEY, BENJAMIN)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/25/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/25/2019. Discovery due by 10/9/2019. Status Report due by 7/11/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/11/19. (blb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FERRELLGAS, INC. from SECOND JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, LEON COUNTY, FL, case number 2019 CA 000337. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4516907.), filed by FERRELLGAS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SHARKEY, BENJAMIN)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SHARKEY, BENJAMIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARVELL v. FERRELLGAS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERRELLGAS, INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN DAVID SHARKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERRELLGAS INC
Represented By: BENJAMIN DAVID SHARKEY
Represented By: BRIAN LEE HAYDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER HARVELL
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Represented By: ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?