21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC v. LEE et al
Plaintiff: 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC. and 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC
Defendant: ASHLEY MOODY and LAUREL M LEE
Intervenor: MICHAEL KATIN
Case Number: 4:2019cv00298
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 70 RULE 26 Disclosures by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC. (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #61 Rule 26 Report :(Discovery due by 10/29/2019., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 11/19/2019., Bench Trial set for 4/20/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER., Mediation Report due by 12/10/2019.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 08/21/2019. (toy)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING #3 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - To the extent it is renewed, Defendant Moody's motion to strike Dr. Argue's testimony is DENIED. The parties shall proceed with discovery according to this Court's scheduling order. ECF No. #10 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/21/2019. (erl)
August 20, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #61 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Conference (toy)
August 16, 2019 Filing 67 Clarification of the Closing Argument of the Attorney General In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction Re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ASHLEY MOODY. (WINSHIP, BLAINE) Modified on 8/19/2019 to match PDF title (toy).
August 15, 2019 Filing 66 RULE 26 Disclosures by ASHLEY MOODY. (WINSHIP, BLAINE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 65 RULE 26 Disclosures by MICHAEL KATIN. (SUAREZ, LUIS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ASHLEY MOODY. (WINSHIP, BLAINE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by MICHAEL KATIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Injunction Hearing Transcript (Aug. 9, 2019)) (SUAREZ, LUIS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Post Hearing Brief filed by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC. (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 61 Joint Report of RULE 26(f) Conference by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC. (LEVESQUE, GEORGE) Modified on 8/20/2019 to match PDF title (toy).
August 12, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Filing Senate Committee Meeting Transcript by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC (Attachments: #1 Senate Committee meeting transcript) (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 59 USCA Case Number 19-13047-K for #45 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by LAUREL M LEE. (toy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by LAUREL M LEE (DAVIS, ASHLEY)
August 11, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRELIMINARY INJUCTION Proceedings held on 8/9/2019, before Judge Mark E. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan A. Hague, Telephone number 850-422-0011. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2019. (mah)
August 11, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of *EXCERPT* Preliminary injunction Proceedings - Closing remarks held on 8/9/2019, before Judge Mark E. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan A. Hague, Telephone number 8504220011. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2019. (mah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Motion Hearing held on 8/9/2019 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Court hears argument from both sides regarding the #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ruling by Court: Briefs due by 6:00 PM on 8/14/2019. Plaintiff's video transcription due by 6:00 PM on 8/12/2019. Order to follow (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) (vkm)
August 9, 2019 Filing 54 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #45 Notice of Appeal. (toy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 53 Appeal Instructions re: #45 Notice of Appeal : The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 8/23/2019. (toy)
August 8, 2019 Set Deadlines re #45 Notice of Appeal : Clerk to check status of Appeal on 11/9/2019. (toy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE RESCHEDULED MOTION HEARING Re: #3 MOTION for for Preliminary Injunction.PLEASE NOTE ONLY THE HEARING TIME HAS CHANGED: Motion Hearing reset for 8/9/2019 08:30 AM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. United States Courthouse, Courtroom 5 West, 111 North Adams St., Tallahassee, Florida 32301. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as, a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Victoria Milton McGee at 850-521-3510 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Victoria Milton McGeeCourtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AS TO SECRETARY OF STATE PENDING APPEAL - This Court has considered, after emergency hearing on August 8, 2019, Defendant Laurel M. Lee's Blinco Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. ECF No. #46 . As stated on the record, and without objection, this motion is GRANTED IN PART. This litigation is hereby STAYED as to Secretary Lee only pending her appeal of this Court's Order, ECF No. #32 , granting in part and denying in part her motion to dismiss. This litigation will proceed as to all remaining parties, and the preliminary injunction hearing shall go forward as scheduled. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/8/2019. (vkm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2019 re #46 MOTION to Stay re #45 Notice of Appeal. Court hears argument Re: #46 Motion to Stay. Ruling by Court: #46 Motion to Stay granted in part, denied in part. Preliminary injunction hearing to begin at 8:30 a.m. tomorrow. Order to follow (Court Reporter Dana Reeves). (vkm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC HEARING Re: #46 MOTION to Stay re #45 Notice of Appeal: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2019 04:00 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is comprised by these devices. s/ Victoria Milton McGeeCourtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S #44 MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 08/08/2019. (toy)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #36 MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 08/08/2019. (toy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Stay re #45 Notice of Appeal by LAUREL M LEE. (DAVIS, ASHLEY)
August 8, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #32 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by LAUREL M LEE. ( Filing fee $505 Receipt Number AFLNDC-4582307.) (DAVIS, ASHLEY)
August 8, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION Judicial Notice by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Articles of Organization, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - SEC Filing) (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
August 7, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION for Judicial Notice filed by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Katin Practitioner Profile) (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
August 7, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A _Capps Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B_SCHR Articles of Organization, #3 Exhibit C_ Report of Dr. Argue, #4 Errata D_ Rebuttal Report of Dr. Argue) (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
August 7, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE to Produce by MICHAEL KATIN (SUAREZ, LUIS)
August 7, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Filing Dr. Capps' Deposition Transcript and Exhibits by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript Volume 1, #2 Deposition Transcript Volume 2, #3 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Deposition Exhibit 9) (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
August 6, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Transcript of David Argue, Ph.D by MICHAEL KATIN re #35 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Depo Transcript of David Argue,Ph.D., #2 Exhibit Ex 1 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #5 Exhibit Ex 4 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #6 Exhibit Ex 5 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #7 Exhibit Ex 6 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #8 Exhibit Ex 7 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #9 Exhibit Ex 8 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #10 Exhibit Ex 9 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #11 Exhibit Ex 10 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #12 Exhibit Ex 11 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #13 Exhibit Ex 12 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #14 Exhibit Ex 13 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #15 Exhibit Ex 14 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #16 Exhibit Ex 15 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #17 Exhibit Ex 16 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #18 Exhibit Ex 17 of Depo Trans of D Argue, #19 Exhibit Ex 18 of Depo Trans of D Argue) (SUAREZ, LUIS)
August 6, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Transcript of James W.Orr, M.D. by MICHAEL KATIN re #35 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Depo Transc. James Orr, M.D., #2 Exhibit Ex 1 to Depo Transc., #3 Exhibit Ex 1 to Depo Transc., #4 Exhibit Ex 1 to Depo Transc., #5 Exhibit Ex 1 to Depo Transc., #6 Exhibit Ex 1 to Depo Transc.) (SUAREZ, LUIS)
August 5, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Exhibits by MICHAEL KATIN re #36 MOTION for Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DOH Practicioner Profile Search, #2 Exhibit C1 - 21C "Medical Specialties" Webpage, #3 Exhibit C2 - 21C California - Radiation Oncology Webpage, #4 Exhibit C3 - 21C Rhode Island - Radiation Oncology Webpage) (SUAREZ, LUIS)
August 3, 2019 Set Response to Motion Deadlines as to #36 MOTION for Judicial Notice . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/19/2019). (toy)
August 3, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Judicial Notice by MICHAEL KATIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DOH Practicioner Profile Search, #2 Exhibit B - 21C 2015 Form 10-K Excerpt, #3 Exhibit C1 - 21C "Medical Specialties" Webpage, #4 Exhibit C2 - 21C California - Radiation Oncology Webpage, #5 Exhibit C3 - 21C Rhode Island - Radiation Oncology Webpage) (SUAREZ, LUIS)
August 3, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by MICHAEL KATIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Capps Expert Report, #2 Exhibit B - Dr. Argue Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Dr. Orr Deposition Excerpts) (SUAREZ, LUIS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ASHLEY MOODY. (WINSHIP, BLAINE)
August 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/1/2019. (toy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT ON DISCOVERY by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC. (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT LAUREL M. LEE'S #23 MOTION TO DISMISS. GRANTED IN PART with respect to Count IV and V of the Complaint and DENIED IN PART with respect to the remaining counts. Counts IV and V of the Complaint, ECF No. #1 , are hereby DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction as against Defendant, Florida Attorney General Ashley Moody. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/26/2019. (toy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER:Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/22/2019. Parties discuss scheduling of depositions. (Court Reporter Megan Hague) (ckm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by RAOUL G CANTERO on behalf of MICHAEL KATIN (CANTERO, RAOUL)
July 21, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #25 MOTION Motion For Expedited Status Conference re #21 Order,, filed by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC. (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
July 19, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC. (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORE TENUS ORDER granting #25 Motion For Expedited Status Conferenceentered by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/19/19. (tss)
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 12:15 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audioconnection is comprised by these devices. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ TiAnn Stark Courtroom Deputy Clerk (tss)
July 19, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION Motion For Expedited Status Conference re #21 Order,, by MICHAEL KATIN, ASHLEY MOODY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SUAREZ, LUIS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC identifying Corporate Parent 21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc. for 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC.. (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
July 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #10 Scheduling Order. *Corporate Disclosure Statement not filed* (toy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 Secretary's Motion to Dismiss by LAUREL M LEE. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/26/2019). (DAVIS, ASHLEY) Modified on 7/15/2019 to match PDF title (toy).
July 5, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing on #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2019 09:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. 111 North Adams St., Tallahassee, Florida 32301. NOTE: If you or any party, witness, or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Victoria Milton McGee at 850-521-3501 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Kimberly WestphalDeputy Clerk (kjw)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PROCEEDINGS. The schedule as stated in Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Proposed Schedule, ECF No. #20 , is ADOPTED. Defendants' ore tenus motion for extension of time to file an answer is GRANTED. Leave for Plaintiff to file a reply to Defendants' and Intervenor's responses to Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction is GRANTED. The Clerk shall set this matter for hearing in Tallahassee, Florida on Friday, August 9, 2019, beginning at 9:00 a.m., and shall issue a notice to that effect. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/5/2019. (kjw)
July 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Schedule for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
July 5, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Scheduling Conference held on 7/5/2019. Parties discuss timeline for preliminary injunction hearing. Ruling by Court: Parties to file notice by 4:00 pm on 7/5/2019, of agreed schedule. Preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for 8/9/2019 09:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Defendants' ore tenus motion for extension of time to file an answer is granted, a new answer deadline will be set after the preliminary injunction hearing. Order to follow (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (vkm)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 MOTION TO INTERVENE - The Clerk is directed to connect Dr. Katin's counsel to CM/ECF. The Clerk is also directed to inform Dr. Katin's counsel of this morning's telephonic status hearing at 10 a.m. Eastern Standard Time. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/5/2019. (vkm)***INTERVENOR COUNSEL NOTIFIED AS DIRECTED***
July 4, 2019 Set Response to Motion Deadline as to #17 MOTION to Intervene and Supporting Memorandum of Law. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/18/2019). (toy)
July 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Intervene and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Michael Katin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Katin Employment Agreements) (SUAREZ, LUIS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (MCVAY, BRADLEY)
July 2, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings LAUREL M LEE answer due 7/19/2019; ASHLEY MOODY answer due 7/19/2019. (toy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/5/2019 10:00 AM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is comprised by these devices. s/ Victoria Milton McGeeCourtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Verified Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction served on Ashley Moody, in her official capacity as Attorney General of Florida on 6/28/2019, filed by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC. (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Verified Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction served on Laurel M. Lee, in her official capacity as Secretary of State of Florida on 6/28/2019, filed by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC. (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE GAIL DEWOLF on behalf of 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC (DEWOLF, DIANE)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BLAINE H WINSHIP on behalf of ASHLEY MOODY (WINSHIP, BLAINE)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/15/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/14/2019. Discovery due by 10/29/2019. Status Report due by 8/1/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/01/2019. (toy)
June 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CONFERENCE SCHEDULE. The Clerk shall set this matter for a telephonic scheduling conference on Friday, July 5, 2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/30/2019. (kjw)
June 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S #3 VERIFIED EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/30/2019. (kjw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CINDY A LAQUIDARA on behalf of 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC (LAQUIDARA, CINDY)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E DAVIS on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (DAVIS, ASHLEY)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER S CARVER on behalf of 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC (CARVER, CHRISTOPHER)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LAUREL M LEE, ASHLEY MOODY. (Attachments: #1 Ashley Moody Summons) (toy)
June 27, 2019 Set Response to Motion Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/11/2019). (toy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Verified EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction, And Incorporated Memorandum of Law by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D Proposed Order) (LEVESQUE, GEORGE) Modified on 6/28/2019 to match PDF title (toy).
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4535270.), filed by 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons to Laurel M. Lee, #5 Summons to Ashley Moody) (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC v. LEE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY MOODY
Represented By: BLAINE H WINSHIP
Represented By: DANIEL WILLIAM BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREL M LEE
Represented By: BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC.
Represented By: GEORGE TY LEVESQUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 21ST CENTURY ONCOLOGY INC
Represented By: GEORGE TY LEVESQUE
Represented By: DIANE GAIL DEWOLF
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S CARVER
Represented By: ALLISON GOODSON
Represented By: D TY JACKSON
Represented By: CINDY A LAQUIDARA
Represented By: TIMOTHY M CERIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: MICHAEL KATIN
Represented By: LUIS EDUARDO SUAREZ
Represented By: ERNEST JOSEPH MARQUART
Represented By: MARK JURGEN HEISE
Represented By: RAOUL G CANTERO
Represented By: CARL E GOLDFARB
Represented By: THOMAS MICHAEL WOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?