WILSON v. ALLY FINANCIAL
Plaintiff: FREDDIE WILSON
Defendant: ALLY FINANCIAL
Case Number: 4:2019cv00370
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION to Expand the Record. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (blb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION Petition to Expand the Record by FREDDIE WILSON. (blb)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. No further action will be taken on Plaintiff's notice of consent, ECF No. #7 . Plaintiff's motion for entry of a default against Defendant Ally Financial, ECF No. #6 , is DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of an answer or other response to the complaint from the Defendant, upon the filing of an executed or unexecuted summons, or no later than October 30, 2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 09/09/2019. (toy)
September 6, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (toy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by FREDDIE WILSON. Only the Plaintiff signed the form. (toy)
September 5, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION for Default Judgment. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (toy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment by FREDDIE WILSON. (toy) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/9/2019 to correct scanning issues. (kjw))
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ALLY FINANCIAL. (toy)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The docket shall reflect that there is one Defendant in this action: Ally Financial. ECF No. #1 . The Clerk of Court issue a summons for the Defendant, and deliver the summons along with this Order to Plaintiff, who shall be responsible for prompt service of the summons and complaint upon the Defendant. The Clerk shall also forward to Plaintiff the AO-398 Form and two copies of the AO-399 Form to be used if Plaintiff decides to serve the complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d). In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a form for consenting to trial by the magistrate judge, with the case number written on it. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of an answer or other response to the complaint from the Defendant, upon the filing of an executed or unexecuted summons, or no later than October 30, 2019. (Notify Chambers on 10/30/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 08/29/2019. (toy) *Forms provided as instructed*
August 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (toy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (toy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FREDDIE WILSON. (Attachments: #1 IFP Statement) (toy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLY FINANCIAL, filed by FREDDIE WILSON. (No service copies) (toy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. ALLY FINANCIAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLY FINANCIAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDDIE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?