KHALIFE-MEDINA v. BARR et al
Petitioner: JOSE ELIAS KHALIFE-MEDINA
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR, WARDEN, U S ICE FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR, SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, MATTHEW T ALBENCE and KRISTJEN NEILSEN
Case Number: 4:2019cv00393
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Clerk of Court shall substitute ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence in place of Respondent Kristjen Neilsen. The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons to Attorney General of the United States William Barr and ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence. The Clerk of Court shall also prepare a copy of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons, and send those copies to the United States Attorney for this District who shall have until 11/12/2019, in which to file an answer or similar response to the petition. Petitioner shall have until 12/12/2019, in which to file a reply to the answer or response filed by the Respondents. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the filing of an answer or other response to the petition, or no later than 11/12/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 9/10/2019. (cle) *** All paperwork prepared and sent to appropriate parties listed in this Order. ***
August 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (blb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se. (blb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number FLN400037370. Fee status updated to paid. (blb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JOSE ELIAS KHALIFE-MEDINA. (blb)*No copies*

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KHALIFE-MEDINA v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U S ICE FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW T ALBENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KRISTJEN NEILSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSE ELIAS KHALIFE-MEDINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?