CORKER v. MCNEIL et al
Petitioner: MICHAEL CORKER
Respondent: STATE OF FLORIDA, PAROLE, PROBATION and WALTER MCNEIL
Case Number: 4:2019cv00396
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #4 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Clerk of Court shall furnish a copy of the amended petition and this order to Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Florida. Within NINETY (90) DAYS from the date of this order, Respondent shall file an answer as directed by this order. ( Answer due by 1/6/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 10/8/2019. (jcw)(Copies provided to Respondent and AG via certified mail.)
October 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: 7 2 service copies of #4 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus received. (jcw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #6 Order. 2 service copies of #4 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus received. (jcw)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this order, Petitioner shall (1) provide the court with two identical service copies of his amended petition, or (2) submit payment in the amount of $20.00 to the clerk of court for the cost of copying his 20-page amended petition. ( Service Copies/Copy Fee due by 10/24/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/24/2019. (jcw)
September 24, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #4 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL CORKER. (jcw) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/24/2019) (jcw).
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MICHAEL CORKER. (No service copies filed.) (jcw)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The clerk of court shall forward to Petitioner a 2254 form and a form application to proceed in forma pauperis. This case number shall be written on the forms. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this order, Petitioner shall file an amended petition, which shall be typed or clearly written, and submitted on the court form. WITHIN THE SAME TIME, Petitioner shall submit payment in the amount of $5.00, or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 8/26/2019. (Forms sent as ordered.)( Amended Pleadings due by 9/25/2019., Fee due by 9/25/2019.) (jcw)
August 21, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (jcw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MICHAEL CORKER. (No service copies filed. Filing fee was not paid.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORKER v. MCNEIL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL CORKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PAROLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PROBATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WALTER MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?