MOHAMMED v. DAVIS
Plaintiff: CURTIS ALEXANDER MOHAMMED
Defendant: ALAN DAVIS
Case Number: 4:2019cv00464
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff shall show cause, within twenty-one (21) days, why the Court should not recommend this case for dismissal for failure to prosecute and follow the orders of the Court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 11/5/2019. Show Cause Response due by 11/26/2019. (MB)
October 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order. (No Amended Complaint, IFP or Filing fee received per order). (MB)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form for use by prisoners, and a form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint. Also, within thirty (30) days, Plaintiff shall either pay the full $400.00 filing fee or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to the Warden of Jefferson Correctional Institution. (Amended Complaint and IFP or Filing fee due by 10/26/2019.) (Letter mailed to Warden w/ORDER as instructed). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 9/26/2019. (MB)
September 23, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (No service copies/no IFP Motion/fee not paid). (MB)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, CURTIS ALEXANDER MOHAMMED. (MB)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALAN DAVIS, filed by CURTIS ALEXANDER MOHAMMED. (No service copies/no IFP Motion/fee not paid). (MB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOHAMMED v. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS ALEXANDER MOHAMMED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?