CASEY v. CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC
Plaintiff: BRIAN M CASEY and CORNELIUS CANADY
Defendant: CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00491
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Supplemental Complaint or for a More Definite Statement. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/6/2020). (jcw)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Strike ; denying without prejudice #11 Motion to Set Emergency Hearing. The clerk of the court shall strike Plaintiffs "Notice of Filing Second Supplemental Complaint" (Doc. 6 ) from the docket. Plaintiff Caseys "motion to transport petitioners and petition for writ of habeas corpus testificandum," which was filed in state court, is DENIED without prejudice. The clerk of the court shall send to Plaintiffs Casey and Canaday a copy of Defendant's motion to dismiss. On or before January 6, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file a response to the Defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/4/2019. (jcw)(Motion sent as ordered.)
November 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #11 MOTION TO SET EMERGENCY HEARING. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO SET EMERGENCY HEARING by BRIAN M CASEY. (jcw) (Main Document 11 replaced on 11/26/2019) (jcw).
November 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION to Strike . Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike by CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/2/2019). (SANABRIA, VICTOR)
November 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Supplemental Complaint or for a More Definite Statement. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/9/2019). (jcw)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER entered on #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying without prejudice #5 Motion for Hearing; denying #7 Motion for Entry of Default. On or before December 9, 2019, both Plaintiffs shall file a response to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for a More Definite Statement. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 11/18/2019. (jcw)
November 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #8 Response in Opposition. (jcw)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE by CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC re #7 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default . (SANABRIA, VICTOR)
November 13, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #7 Notice of Default. (jcw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Default by BRIAN M CASEY. (jcw) Modified on 11/18/2019 (jcw).
October 29, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: 6 Notice #5 MOTION for Hearing. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (erl)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 *STRICKEN PER #12 ORDER* NOTICE OF FILING SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT by BRIAN M CASEY (erl) Modified on 12/4/2019 (jcw).
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION TO SET HEARINGS by BRIAN M CASEY. (erl)
October 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT OR FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (kdm)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT OR FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC. (SANABRIA, VICTOR) Modified Title on 10/16/2019 (blb).
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (blb)
October 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal - new pro se case (tss)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SHEPPARD, FRANCIS)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC from Leon County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-426. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BFLNDC-4645005.), filed by CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Lower Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (SHEPPARD, FRANCIS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CASEY v. CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN M CASEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORNELIUS CANADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC
Represented By: FRANCIS H SHEPPARD
Represented By: VICTOR G SANABRIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?