LANDMEIER v. TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC
Plaintiff: Dennis Landmeier
Defendant: Tallahassee Memorial HealthCare, Inc. and TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00547
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Plaintiff has filed a Motion to Remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). ECF No. #9 . Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. This Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law cause of action in Count I of Plaintiff's amended complaint. The Clerk shall remand this action to the Circuit Court of the Second Judicial Circuit, in and for Leon County, Florida. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/5/19. (blb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC. (CATTANI, STEPHEN)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by DENNIS LANDMEIER. (ELLIS, ADAM)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC. (CATTANI, STEPHEN)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC, filed by DENNIS LANDMEIER. (ELLIS, ADAM)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM JAMES ELLIS on behalf of DENNIS LANDMEIER (ELLIS, ADAM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN400037909. Fee status updated to paid. (blb)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/19/2019. Discovery due by 3/4/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 2/25/2020. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/5/19. (blb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney STEPHEN AUSTIN CATTANI Re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL- Counsel is advised by this entry for future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website). (blb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (CATTANI, STEPHEN)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tallahassee Memorial HealthCare, Inc. from Second Judicial Circuit Court, Leon County, Florida, case number 2019 CA 001974. (Filing fee $400.), filed by Tallahassee Memorial HealthCare, Inc.. (CATTANI, STEPHEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANDMEIER v. TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Landmeier
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Represented By: ADAM JAMES ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tallahassee Memorial HealthCare, Inc.
Represented By: STEPHEN AUSTIN CATTANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC
Represented By: STEPHEN AUSTIN CATTANI
Represented By: BRANDICE DAVIDSON DICKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?