MARCINIAK v. WALMART INC
Plaintiff: EDWARD MARCINIAK
Defendant: WALMART INC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00565
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Summary Judgment Hearing set for 6/18/2020 10:00 AM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 0618# s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER, re: #22 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. A party with a conflict during that trial period must file a notice by 1/14/2020. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/21/2020. By a separate notice, the clerk must set a summary-judgment hearing for the week of June 29, 2020. Mediation Report due by 5/28/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/30/2019. (kjw) *Case referred to mediation.
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (RUIZ, FABIAN)
November 21, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WALMART INC. (RUIZ, FABIAN)
November 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA ERIN HEYSTEK on behalf of EDWARD MARCINIAK (HEYSTEK, AMANDA)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON RULE 26(f) OBLIGATIONS. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/19/2019. (toy)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/3/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/2/2020. Discovery due by 3/17/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/19/2019. (toy)
November 18, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by WALMART INC. (TURCI, AMY)
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 Case electronically transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:19-cv-02322. Original file with documents 1-15 received.
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #13 Consent Motion to Transfer Venue. The CLERK of this Court shall TRANSFER this action to the Northern District of Florida, Tallahassee Division for all further proceedings. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/15/2019. (GMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Walmart Inc. re #13 Consent MOTION to Change Venue (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A: Consent Order)(Ruiz, Fabian) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Change Venue by Walmart Inc. (Ruiz, Fabian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #11 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including November 11, 2019 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/1/2019. (GMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Walmart Inc.. (Ruiz, Fabian) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #9 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including November 4, 2019 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/16/2019. (GMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Walmart Inc.. (Turci, Amy) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Edward Marciniak. (Hill, Brandon) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Edward Marciniak. Related case(s): y (Hill, Brandon) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 9/23/2019 by Edward Marciniak as to Walmart Inc.. (Hill, Brandon) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/25/2019. (JCG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/25/2019. (JCG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Walmart Inc. (BSN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-2322-T-35SPF. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15933281) filed by Edward Marciniak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hill, Brandon) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARCINIAK v. WALMART INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD MARCINIAK
Represented By: BRANDON J HILL
Represented By: AMANDA ERIN HEYSTEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC
Represented By: AMY HARRISON TURCI
Represented By: FABIAN A RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?