MCBRIDE et al v. BENIFICIAL FLORIDA INC et al
Plaintiff: JOE H SMITH and MARGARET W MCBRIDE
Defendant: US BANK MASTER PARTICIPANT TRUST, BENIFICIAL FLORIDA INC and CALIBER HOME LOANS
Case Number: 4:2019cv00607
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Ruling on the motions for in forma pauperis status, ECF Nos. #2 and #5 , are DEFERRED. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff Margaret W. McBride another civil complaint form and an application packet for requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis by a non-prisoner. The motion requesting an enlargement of time, ECF No. #6 , is GRANTED and Plaintiff has until 3/13/2020, to file an amended complaint and an amended in forma pauperis motion. No later than 3/13/2020, Plaintiff must file a response to this Order which provides the required clarification. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order or no later than 3/13/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/13/20. (blb) *Forms Provided as Directed*
February 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 MOTION to Extend Time. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (blb)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time by JOE H SMITH. (blb)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOE H SMITH. (blb)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order **Duplicate - ORDER deferring ruling on #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/6/2020. (lsd)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Ruling on the motion for in forma pauperis status, ECF No. #2 , is DEFERRED. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff Margaret W. McBride another civil complaint form and an application packet for requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis by a non-prisoner. Plaintiff shall have until 2/6/2020, to file an amended complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written and submitted on court forms, and an in forma pauperis motion. No later than 2/6/2020, Plaintiff must file a response to this Order which provides the clarification concerning the prior state court aciton. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiffs' compliance with this Order or no later than 2/6/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/6/20. (blb)
December 18, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (blb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (blb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOE H SMITH. (blb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MARGARET W MCBRIDE, JOE H SMITH. (blb) *No fee Paid, no copies*

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCBRIDE et al v. BENIFICIAL FLORIDA INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANK MASTER PARTICIPANT TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENIFICIAL FLORIDA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALIBER HOME LOANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE H SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET W MCBRIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?