BRIGGS v. NORTH HIGHLAND ESOP HOLDINGS INC
Plaintiff: Michael Briggs
Defendant: North Highland ESOP Holdings Inc. and NORTH HIGHLAND ESOP HOLDINGS INC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00619
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 26 Disclosures by NORTH HIGHLAND ESOP HOLDINGS INC. (LEITMAN, MELANIE)
February 13, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (rcb)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER :Discovery due by 9/30/2020., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 10/21/2020., Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER., Mediation Report due by 11/11/2020.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 02/12/2020. (rcb)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (HOBBS, RYAN)
January 30, 2020 Set Discovery Status Report Deadline - Status Report due by 3/2/2020. (cle)
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by MICHAEL BRIGGS. (HOBBS, RYAN)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NORTH HIGHLAND ESOP HOLDINGS INC. (LEITMAN, MELANIE)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by NORTH HIGHLAND ESOP HOLDINGS INC. (LEITMAN, MELANIE)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/31/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/14/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/13/2020. Discovery due by 4/29/2020. Status Report due by 1/30/2020. (rcb) Modified on 1/6/2020 to correct Status Report Deadline. (cle).
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney MELANIE ROSE LEITMAN Re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL- Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE RE-FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Further, for future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website). (blb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North Highland ESOP Holdings Inc. from Second Judicial Circuit of Florida, case number 2019-CA-002548. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4757988.), filed by North Highland ESOP Holdings Inc.. (LEITMAN, MELANIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRIGGS v. NORTH HIGHLAND ESOP HOLDINGS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Briggs
Represented By: RYAN BLAKE HOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Highland ESOP Holdings Inc.
Represented By: MELANIE ROSE LEITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH HIGHLAND ESOP HOLDINGS INC
Represented By: MELANIE ROSE LEITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?