ORTIZ v. COLLINS et al
Plaintiff: ISMAEL LUIS ORTIZ
Defendant: PEAVY, WEATHERSPOON, GRAHAM, P JOHNSON, M ANDERSON, A JOHNS, STALNAKER, JULIE L JONES, D S COLLINS, PRIDE, A PRESEAV and S BEARDEN
Case Number: 4:2020cv00007
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED COMPLAINT. The clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by state prisoners in actions under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file either a notice of voluntary dismissal or an amended complaint. (Amended Complaint due by 3/30/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 2/27/2020. (form to Pla) (sdw)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Complaint filed by ISMAEL LUIS ORTIZ. (received 1 service copy) (sdw)
February 12, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (sdw)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Because Plaintiff has funds in his inmate account, the clerk shall assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff must file an initial partial filing fee of $25.70. As funds become available in Plaintiff's inmate account, Plaintiff is required to make monthly payments of twenty (20) percent of the preceding month's income. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to the Department of Corrections. The clerk shall refer the complaint (ECF Doc. #1 ) to chambers for preliminary screening under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, 1915(e)(2). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 2/11/2020. (sdw)
February 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ISMAEL LUIS ORTIZ. (sdw)
February 4, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #4 Order. (no filing fee/IFP motion) (sdw)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Doc. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a complete set of forms needed for filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. This case number should be written on the forms. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either file a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $400.00 filing fee. (IFP motion/Fee due by 2/3/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 1/13/2020. (form to Pla) (sdw)
January 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se litigant ISMAEL LUIS ORTIZ. (sdw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ISMAEL LUIS ORTIZ. (sdw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M ANDERSON, S BEARDEN, D S COLLINS, GRAHAM, A JOHNS, P JOHNSON, JULIE L JONES, PEAVY, A PRESEAV, PRIDE, STALNAKER, and WEATHERSPOON filed by ISMAEL LUIS ORTIZ. (no service copies) (sdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ORTIZ v. COLLINS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEAVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEATHERSPOON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STALNAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE L JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D S COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A PRESEAV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S BEARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISMAEL LUIS ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?