DONALDSON v. COKER et al
Plaintiff: JOEY ARNEZ DONALDSON
Defendant: J COKER, HAWKINS, JACKSON and BENNETT
Case Number: 4:2020cv00076
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
2 Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/3/2020. Motions referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:20cv76-WS/MAF. (amm)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $6.00. Plaintiff has until 4/22/2020 to submit the initial partial filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall mail this Order with an appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500. Notify Chambers on 4/22/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 3/20/2020. (kjw) *Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. *Copy of order mailed to DOC as directed.
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se (rcb)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JOEY ARNEZ DONALDSON. (rcb)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by JOEY ARNEZ DONALDSON. (rcb)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOEY ARNEZ DONALDSON. (rcb)**(1) Service copies received for ECF #1 , #2 and #3 **
February 10, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (rcb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DONALDSON v. COKER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J COKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAWKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEY ARNEZ DONALDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?