ASH v. GADSDEN COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS
Plaintiff: Freddie Ash
Defendant: Gadsden County Supervisor of Elections
Case Number: 4:2020cv00092
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
2 Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING PARTIES' PROPOSED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE. The parties' proposed alternative discovery schedule is hereby ADOPTED. All discovery shall be commenced in time to be completed by 11/1/2020. Potentially dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by 11/21/2020. Plaintiff's counsel shall advise the court on or before 11/1/2020 whether and when the parties will attend mediation. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 4/8/2020. (rcb)
April 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (rcb)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (TAYLOR, JASON)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/3/2020. **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:20cv92-WS/MAF. (amm)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses by GADSDEN COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS. (TAYLOR, JASON) Modified to edit title on 3/9/2020 (rcb).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/6/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/6/2020. Discovery due by 6/17/2020. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 02/21/2020. (rcb)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal to Adverse Party by Gadsden County Supervisor of Elections re #1 Notice of Removal, (TAYLOR, JASON)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (TAYLOR, JASON)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 Defendant's Notice of Removal from Circuit Court in and for Gadsden County, case number 2020 CA 000056. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BFLNDC-4863377.), filed by Gadsden County Supervisor of Elections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Documents) (TAYLOR, JASON) Modified to edit title on 2/18/2020 (rcb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASH v. GADSDEN COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Ash
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gadsden County Supervisor of Elections
Represented By: JASON CURTIS TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?