SMITH v. AMAZON.COM INC
Plaintiff: Mr LOGAN SMITH and LOGAN SMITH
Defendant: AMAZON.COM INC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00166
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
2 Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The deadline for the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) attorney conference is 6/17/2020. The deadline to file the Rule 26(f) report is 7/1/2020. Absent good cause set out in the 26(f) report, the discovery deadline will be 1/19/2021, and the trial will occur during the two-week period that begins on 5/3/2021 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Each nongovernmental corporate party must file a disclosure statement as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1. If not filed sooner, the statement must be filed within 14 days after entry of this order. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/10/2020 Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/27/2020. (rcb)
May 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: 8 Docket Annotation (rcb)*An ISO is needed**
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: An ISO is needed. (rcb)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant Amazon.Com Inc's Answer And Defenses To Plaintiff's Complaint For Damages. (DUGA, NICOLE) Modified to edit title on 5/14/2020 (rcb).
May 12, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Answer due by 5/14/2020. (rcb)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Return of Service-Amazon.Com (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service) (LEWIS, HALLEY) Modified to edit title on 5/12/2020 (rcb).
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AMAZON.COM INC. (rcb)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued by LOGAN SMITH (LEWIS, HALLEY)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/3/2020. **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:20cv166-RH/MAF. (amm)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LEWIS, HALLEY)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMAZON.COM INC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5026307.), filed by LOGAN SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (LEWIS, HALLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. AMAZON.COM INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM INC
Represented By: NICOLE DANIELLE DUGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr LOGAN SMITH
Represented By: HALLEY BRONSON LEWIS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOGAN SMITH
Represented By: HALLEY BRONSON LEWIS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?