STAHL-MEYER FOODS INC v. MEAT PACKERS AND BUTCHERS COMPANY INC
Plaintiff: STAHL-MEYER FOODS INC
Defendant: MEAT PACKERS AND BUTCHERS COMPANY INC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00199
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MEAT PACKERS AND BUTCHERS COMPANY INC. (cle)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Meat Packers and Butchers Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit in Support of Request for Default, #2 Exhibit 2-Proposed Default) (ANDREWS, RYAN)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STAHL-MEYER FOODS INC. MEAT PACKERS AND BUTCHERS COMPANY INC served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (ANDREWS, RYAN)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number FLN400038967. Fee status updated to paid. (cle)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MEAT PACKERS AND BUTCHERS COMPANY, INC. (cle)
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ANDREWS, RYAN)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MEAT PACKERS AND BUTCHERS COMPANY, INC (Filing fee $400.), filed by STAHL-MEYER FOODS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons to be issued) (ANDREWS, RYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STAHL-MEYER FOODS INC v. MEAT PACKERS AND BUTCHERS COMPANY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STAHL-MEYER FOODS INC
Represented By: RYAN JOSHUA ANDREWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEAT PACKERS AND BUTCHERS COMPANY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?