EDENFIELD v. LONG et al
Petitioner: ORRIN D EDENFIELD
Respondent: JEFF LONG, PHILIP WEISER and ASHLEY MOODY
Case Number: 4:2020cv00231
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #7 Notice of Appearance. (blb)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BARBARA CATHERINE DEBELIUS-ENEMARK, I on behalf of ASHLEY MOODY (DEBELIUS-ENEMARK, BARBARA)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE TO 2254 PETITION. The Clerk shall serve copies of the habeas corpus petition (ECF No. #1 ) and this order on Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Florida. Respondent shall file an answer, motion, or other response to the petition on or before 8/26/2020. Petitioner shall file a reply, if any, no later than 9/25/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 5/28/20. (blb) *Documents Provided as Directed*
May 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #5 Filing Fee Received. (blb)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number FLN400039202. Fee status updated to paid. (blb)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS REQUEST FOR MONEY ORDER by ORRIN D EDENFIELD re #3 Order RE FEE. (blb)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Petitioner an application for leave to proceed IFP. Petitioner shall have until 6/8/2020, to either file an IFP application or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 5/7/20. (blb) *Form Provided*
May 4, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (blb)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (blb)
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ORRIN D EDENFIELD. (blb) *No Copies, No Fee*

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EDENFIELD v. LONG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JEFF LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PHILIP WEISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ASHLEY MOODY
Represented By: BARBARA CATHERINE DEBELIUS-ENEMARK, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ORRIN D EDENFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?