ZAVIER v. BARR et al
Petitioner: GARDINER ZAVIER
Respondent: SCOOT TAFF, WILLIAM BARR, JOHN KELLY and CHAD WOLF
Case Number: 4:2020cv00245
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #8 Notice of Appearance. (cle)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by LENNARD B REGISTER, III on behalf of WILLIAM BARR, SCOOT TAFF, CHAD WOLF (REGISTER, LENNARD)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM BARR - U.S. Attorney General, CHAD WOLF, and U.S. Attorney. (cle)
May 11, 2020 Set Deadlines - Answer due by 7/10/2020. Reply due by 7/31/2020. (cle)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Petitioners motion for in forma pauperis, ECF No. #2 , is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court shall substitute Acting Secretary Chad Wolf as Respondent in place of former Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly. The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons to Attorney General of the United States William Barr and Acting Secretary Chad Wolf. The Clerk of Court shall also prepare a copy of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons, and send those documents to the United States Attorney for this District who shall have until July 10, 2020, in which to file an answer or similar response to the petition. Petitioner shall have until July 31, 2020, in which to file a reply to the answer or response filed by the Respondents.The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the filing of an answer or other response to the petition, or no later than July 10, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 5/11/2020. (cle) *** All paperwork prepared and sent to USA, US AG and Defendant Wolf. ***
May 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by GARDINER ZAVIER. (cle)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Filing Fee: $5.00, receipt number FLN400039091. Fee status updated to paid. (cle)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by GARDINER ZAVIER. (cle)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by GARDINER ZAVIER. (cle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZAVIER v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SCOOT TAFF
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GARDINER ZAVIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?