MIGUEL v. JAYROE
Defendant: MICHAEL MEADE, JARED MILLER and CHAD WOLFE
Petitioner: MARTINEZ DIAZ MIGUEL
Respondent: C JAYROE and WILLIAM P BARR
Case Number: 4:2020cv00276
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #9 Mail Returned. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)**Per Wakulla County Jail-Petitioner released-no release information could be provided**
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MARTINEZ DIAZ MIGUEL Re: #8 (rcb)
July 1, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Notify Chambers and Amended Pleadings due by 7/10/2020. (rcb)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Petitioner's motion for the appointment of counsel, ECF No. #7 , is DENIED without prejudice. Petitioner has until July 10, 2020, in which to file a second amended habeas petition. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon Petitioner's compliance with this Order, or no later than July 10, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 7/1/2020. (rcb)
June 30, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #7 Motion for Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To 18 USC 3006A Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To 18 USC 3006A by MARTINEZ DIAZ MIGUEL. (rcb)
June 12, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Notify Chambers on 7/10/2020. Second Amended Pleadings due by 7/10/2020. (rcb)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER.Petitioner's in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #5 , is GRANTED and Petitioner is not required to pay the filing fee for this case. The Clerk of Court shall provide Petitioner with another 2241 habeas petition form so Petitioner can comply with this Order. Petitioner has until July 10, 2020, in which to file a second amended habeas petition. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon Petitioner's compliance with this Order, or no later than July 10, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/11/2020. (rcb)** 2241 Habeas Petition Form Forwarded As Directed**
June 10, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by MARTINEZ DIAZ MIGUEL. (rcb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 SECOND PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MARTINEZ DIAZ MIGUEL on 6/10/2020 (rcb).
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall provide Petitioner with a 2241 habeas petition form and an in forma pauperis application packet. Petitioner has until 6/30/2020, in which to file a habeas petition on the form provided, and to either file an in forma pauperis motion or submit payment of the $5.00 filing fee to the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon Petitioner's compliance with this Order, or no later than 6/30/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 06/03/2020. (rcb) ** 2241 Habeas Petition & IFP Application forwarded as directed**
May 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (rcb)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MARTINEZ DIAZ MIGUEL. (rcb)**No Service Copy or IFP Motion Received**

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIGUEL v. JAYROE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARTINEZ DIAZ MIGUEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C JAYROE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL MEADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JARED MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WOLFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?