KAHRIC v. BARR et al
Petitioner: ARMIN KAHRIC
Respondent: MICHAEL MEADE, JARED MILLER, WILLIAM P BARR and CHAD WOLF
Case Number: 4:2020cv00296
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Notify Chambers and Replies due by 8/28/2020. (rcb)
July 31, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #8 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PETITIONFOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Ruling remains DEFERRED on Petitioner's motion for the appointment of counsel, ECF No. #2 , pending receipt of Petitioner's reply. Petitioner has until August 28, 2020, in which to file a reply to the answer filed by Respondents, ECF No. #8 . The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the filing of an answer or other response to the petition, or no later than August 28, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 7/30/2020. (rcb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2_Declaration of DDO Lasker, #2 Exhibit 1_Declaration of DO Jayroe) (REGISTER, LENNARD) Modified to edit title on 7/31/2020 (rcb).
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by LENNARD B REGISTER, III on behalf of WILLIAM P BARR, MICHAEL MEADE (REGISTER, LENNARD)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney (rcb)
June 8, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Notify Chambers on 8/7/2020. Answer due by 8/7/2020. Replies due by 8/28/2020. (rcb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM P BARR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Issued-ICE Acting Director) (rcb)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall substitute ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence as Respondent in place of Chad Wolf, the Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security. Ruling is DEFERRED on Petitioners motion for the appointment of counsel. The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons to Attorney General of the United States William Barr and ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence. The Clerk of Court shall prepare copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons, and send those documents to the United States Attorney for this District who shall have until August 7, 2020, in which to file an answer or similar response to the petition. Petitioner shall have until August 28, 2020, in which to file a reply to the answer or response filed by the Respondents. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the filing of an answer or other response to the petition, or no later than August 7, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/8/2020. (rcb)**ECF #1 , #4 , Forwarded to Attorney General William Barr, ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence & US Attorney**
June 5, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Filing Fee Received, #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (rcb)
June 4, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number FLN400039281. Fee status updated to paid. (rcb)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Motion For Appointment Of Counsel Pursuant To 18 USC 3006A by ARMIN KAHRIC. (rcb)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ARMIN KAHRIC. (rcb)**Service Copy Received**

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAHRIC v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL MEADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JARED MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ARMIN KAHRIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?