RODULFO-RAMIREZ v. BARR et al
Petitioner: FRANCISCO JAVIER RODULFO-RAMIREZ
Respondent: JOHN KELLY, WILLIAM BARR and CHAD WOLF
Case Number: 4:2020cv00303
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM BARR, - U.S. Attorney General, CHAD WOLF, and U.S. Attorney. (cle)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED and Petitioner is not required to pay the filing fee for this case. Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security is automatically substituted as a Respondent in this case for former Secretary John Kelly. The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons to Attorney General of the United States William Barr and Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security Chad Wolf. The Clerk of Court shall prepare another copy of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons, and send those documents to the United States Attorney for this District who shall have until August 11, 2020, in which to file an answer or similar response to the petition. Petitioner shall have until September 8, 2020, in which to file a reply to the answer or response filed by the Respondents. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the filing of an answer or other response to the petition, or no later than August 11, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/10/2020. (cle) *** Paperwork prepared and sent to US AG, Def. Wolf and USA. ***
June 9, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by FRANCISCO JAVIER RODULFO-RAMIREZ. (cle)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by FRANCISCO JAVIER RODULFO-RAMIREZ. (cle) ** No Service Copies provided. ***

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODULFO-RAMIREZ v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FRANCISCO JAVIER RODULFO-RAMIREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?