GLADE v. CAMBRIDGE GROUP HOLDINGS CO
Plaintiff: MARSHALL GLADE
Defendant: CAMBRIDGE GROUP HOLDINGS CO and HOLDINGS COMPANY INC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00325
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO IMMEDIATELY WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE OF THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING - Cambridge's "Motion to Immediately Withdraw the Reference of This Adversary Proceeding" (ECF No. #1 , Ex. 2) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal if and when the Bankruptcy Court certifies that the action is ready for trial. The clerk shall close the case. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 7/9/2020. (cle)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order - Appellant Brief due by 8/1/2020. Appellee Brief due by 8/31/2020. Appellant Reply Brief due by 9/14/2020. (cle)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLETE RECORD OF MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF REFERENCE by CAMBRIDGE GROUP HOLDINGS CO (Attachments: #1 Certified Public Docket) (Romine, Carolyn)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 Supplemental Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet; (Attachments: #1 Cert Copy of Public Docket, #2 Bkr Doc. 47 Trustee's Limited Objection) (lmi)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 Inital Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet (Attachments: #1 Cert Copy of BK Public Docket, #2 BK Doc.38. Motion for Withdrawal of Reference) (lmi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLADE v. CAMBRIDGE GROUP HOLDINGS CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBRIDGE GROUP HOLDINGS CO
Represented By: MATTHEW TY PERSON
Represented By: JOSHUA D CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLDINGS COMPANY INC
Represented By: MATTHEW TY PERSON
Represented By: JOSHUA D CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARSHALL GLADE
Represented By: GARY M FREEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?