MOODY v. INCH et al
Plaintiff: JESSE EDWARD MOODY, JR
Defendant: Z CULPEPPER, MARK S INCH, JAMES UPCHURCH and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 4:2020cv00338
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #6 First Amended Complaint. (sdw)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Z CULPEPPER, JOHN DOE, MARK S INCH, and JAMES UPCHURCH filed by JESSE EDWARD MOODY, JR. (no service copies) (sdw)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED COMPLAINT. The clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by state prisoners in actions under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file either a notice of voluntary dismissal or an amended complaint. (Amended Complaint due by 8/17/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 07/17/2020. (form to Pla) (sdw)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This case may proceed without prepayment of the entire filing fee. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk. (Order and letter mailed.) Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 7/10/2020. (alb)
July 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se litigant JESSE EDWARD MOODY, JR. (sdw)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JESSE EDWARD MOODY, JR. (sdw)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Z CULPEPPER, JOHN DOE, MARK S INCH, and JAMES UPCHURCH filed by JESSE EDWARD MOODY, JR. (no service copies) (sdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOODY v. INCH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z CULPEPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK S INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES UPCHURCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE EDWARD MOODY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?