MARTINEZ CABRERA v. BARR et al
Petitioner: EZEQUIEL ESTABAN MARTINEZ CABRERA
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR, MATTHEW T ALBENCE and JOHN KELLY
Case Number: 4:2020cv00352
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW T ALBENCE, U.S. Attorney Lawrence Keefe and U.S. Attorney General William Barr (rcb)
July 17, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Notify Chambers, US Attorney's Answer & Replies due by 10/5/2020. (rcb)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER.The Clerk of Court shall substitute ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence as Respondent in place of John Kelly, the former Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security.Petitioners motion for in forma pauperis status, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED and Petitioner is not required to pay the filing fee.The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons to Attorney General of the United States William Barr and ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence. The Clerk of Court shall prepare copies of this Order, the petition,ECF No. #1 , and summons, and send those documents to the United States Attorney for this District who shall have until September 14, 2020, in which to file an answer or similar response to the petition. Petitioner shall have until October 5, 2020, in which to file a reply to the answer or response filed by the Respondents. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the filing of an answer or other response to the petition, or no later than September 14, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 7/16/2020. (rcb)**Summonses for US AG William Barr, ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence & US Attorney Lawrence Keefe with ECF #1 and #4 forwarded as directed**
July 15, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas as Corpus, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (rcb)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by EZEQUIEL ESTABAN MARTINEZ CABRERA. (rcb)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by EZEQUIEL ESTABAN MARTINEZ CABRERA. (rcb)**No Service Copy Provided**

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTINEZ CABRERA v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW T ALBENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EZEQUIEL ESTABAN MARTINEZ CABRERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?