DANIELS v. TRANS UNION LLC
Plaintiff: Jimmy Daniels
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00364
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadline - CRD to review case and prepare PTO by 10/30/2020. (tss)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER entered pursuant to #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/16/20. Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Mediation Report due by 12/28/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. Case referred to mediation. (tss)
September 3, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (blb)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (KERSEY, JOSHUA)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA RYAN KERSEY on behalf of JIMMY DANIELS (KERSEY, JOSHUA)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 8/14/20. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate) Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/7/2020. Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss)
August 14, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint and #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement. An ISO is needed. (blb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TRANS UNION LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TRANS UNION LLC.. (LONG, CHARLOTTE)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TRANS UNION LLC. (LONG, CHARLOTTE)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JIMMY DANIELS. TRANS UNION LLC served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (DERRY, JASON)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TRANS UNION LLC. (blb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney JASON ROBERT DERRY Re #1 COMPLAINT- Counsel is advised by this entry, that in future case filings the Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". Further, for future case openings: Please review the procedures in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User''s Guide", (both available on the clerk''s website) specifically in regards to the use of UPPERCASE in the parties names and style of the case. (blb)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trans Union LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5516020.), filed by JIMMY DANIELS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (DERRY, JASON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DANIELS v. TRANS UNION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Daniels
Represented By: JASON ROBERT DERRY
Represented By: JOSHUA RYAN KERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: CHARLOTTE A LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?