THORPE v. SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, STATE OF FLORIDA
Petitioner: CHRISTOPHER J. THORPE
Respondent: SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, STATE OF FLORIDA and SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS STATE OF FLORIDA
Case Number: 4:2020cv00408
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by HOLLY NOEL SIMCOX on behalf of SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS STATE OF FLORIDA (SIMCOX, HOLLY)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #4 Order. (Received 2 service copies/service copy with copy of ORDER mailed to both the Respondent and Attorney General as instructed). (mb)
August 21, 2020 Set Deadlines re #4 Order. Response to habeas petition due by11/20/2020. (sdw)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SERVICE COPIES, SERVICE OF THE PETITION, AND A RESPONSE BY THE STATE. Petitioner shall provide two (2) service copies of the petition (ECF Doc. #1 ) to the clerk. Upon receipt of the service copies, the clerk shall serve the petition and this order on Respondent and on the Attorney General of the State of Florida. Respondent shall have ninety (90) days from the date of this order to file an answer as directed by this order. The motion to exceed word limit, ECF Doc. #3 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 08/21/2020. (sdw)
August 19, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION for leave to exceed memorandum of law word limit , #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to exceed memorandum of law word limit by CHRISTOPHER J. THORPE. (UFFERMAN, MICHAEL)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (UFFERMAN, MICHAEL)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number AFLNDC-5592469.), filed by CHRISTOPHER J. THORPE. (UFFERMAN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THORPE v. SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHRISTOPHER J. THORPE
Represented By: MICHAEL ROBERT UFFERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: HOLLY NOEL SIMCOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?