WILLIAMS v. JOHN HANCOCK INSURANCE et al
Plaintiff: PHILLIP A WILLIAMS
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and JOHN HANCOCK INSURANCE
Case Number: 4:2020cv00409
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before 10/16/2020, Plaintiff shall pay the full $400.00 filing fee or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis for non-prisoners, using the Northern District of Florida form. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/16/2020. (jcw)
August 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (cle)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by PHILLIP A WILLIAMS. (cle)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and JOHN HANCOCK INSURANCE, filed by PHILLIP A WILLIAMS. (cle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. JOHN HANCOCK INSURANCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN HANCOCK INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP A WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?