JOHNSON v. MASSEY et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT JOHNSON
Defendant: BROWN, A MASSEY and A DOWDEN
Case Number: 4:2020cv00410
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Set Deadlines per ORDER #7 : Notify Chambers on 10/21/2020. Copies of Complaint due by 10/21/2020. (blb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Plaintiff shall have until October 21, 2020, in which to provide the Clerk of Court with three copies of his complaint, ECF No. #1 , that are identical to the complaint as filed with this Court. Plaintiff's motion requesting the appointment of counsel, ECF No. #6 , is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's service copies or no later than October 21, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 9/29/20. (blb)
September 25, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (blb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION REQUESTING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by ROBERT JOHNSON. (blb)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Plaintiff shall have until 9/21/2020, in which to provide the Clerk of Court with three copies of his complaint, ECF No. #1 , that are identical to the complaint as filed with this Court. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's service copies or no later than. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 8/21/20. (blb)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. 3 , is GRANTED to the extent the filing fee does not have to be prepaid. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order with appropriate cover letter, to: Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 8/21/20. (blb) *Letter sent as directed*
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (blb)
August 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (blb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT JOHNSON. (blb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BROWN, A DOWDEN, A MASSEY, filed by ROBERT JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (blb)*No copies*

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. MASSEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A MASSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A DOWDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?