SUSSMAN v. SECRETARY DEPT OF CORRECTIONS
Petitioner: DAVID CHARLES SUSSMAN
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 4:2020cv00412
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #5 ) is GRANTED to the extent that Petitioner may proceed with this case without paying the filing fee. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Petitioner must provide the court with two (2) complete copies of the habeas petition (ECF No. #1 ), with this case number included on each copy. (Service copies due by 10/23/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 9/23/2020. (mb)
September 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (mb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID CHARLES SUSSMAN. (mb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Clerk received 2 incomplete service copies of the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Petitioner did not include the exhibits. (alb)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk is directed to send Petitioner a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate approved for use in the Northern District. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Petitioner must either pay the filing fee of $5.00, or file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (Order and form mailed.) ( Fee due by 9/21/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 08/21/2020. (alb)
August 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (alb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DAVID CHARLES SUSSMAN. (alb) Modified on 8/20/2020 (No service copies, IFP motion or fee.) (alb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUSSMAN v. SECRETARY DEPT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID CHARLES SUSSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?