UPSHAW et al v. ANESTHESIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF TALLAHASSEE PA et al
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF BRENTON A PALMER and CAROL D UPSHAW
Defendant: SANDRA TAMBI, ANESTHESIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF TALLAHASSEE PA, STEVEN MCNOOKIN, GIANCARLO GIOVE, TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE, SOUTHERN MEDICAL GROUP and MARILYN COX
Case Number: 4:2020cv00415
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Plaintiff has until 10/30/2020, to file a response to this Order which clarifies whether a prior case was filed in state court, the results of that case, and whether Plaintiff attended arbitration of claims related to this case. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff another civil complaint form so that Plaintiff can file a second amended complaint. Plaintiff has until 10/30/2020, to file one "second amended complaint". The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon Plaintiff's compliance with this Order or no later than 10/30/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 10/2/2020. (cle) *** Complaint Form sent to the Plaintiff. ***
October 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #5 First Amended Complaint. (cle)
September 29, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #4 Order. The deadline to Respond to this Order has expired. No Response has been filed. (cle)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ANESTHESIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF TALLAHASSEE PA, MARILYN COX, GIANCARLO GIOVE, STEVEN MCNOOKIN, SOUTHERN MEDICAL GROUP, TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE, and SANDRA TAMBI, filed by CAROL D UPSHAW. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Cover Letter) (cle)
August 31, 2020 Set Deadlines - Attorney Appearance Deadline by 9/28/2020. Response Deadline is 9/28/2020. (cle)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff has until September 28, 2020, to file a response to this Order which clarifies whether a prior case was filed in state court, the results of that case, and whether Plaintiff attended arbitration of claims related to this case. If Plaintiff desires to proceed on the behalf of the Estate of Brenton A. Palmer, an attorney must file a notice of appearance in this case on or before September 28, 2020. Plaintiff's motion requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED, and Plaintiff is not required to pay the filing fee for this case. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's amended complaint or no later than September 28, 2020. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 8/28/2020. (cle)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (blb)
August 26, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (blb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CAROL D UPSHAW. (blb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANESTHESIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF TALLAHASSEE PA, STEVEN MCNOOKIN, SANDRA TAMBI, filed by CAROL D UPSHAW. (blb)*No copies*

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UPSHAW et al v. ANESTHESIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF TALLAHASSEE PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA TAMBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANESTHESIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF TALLAHASSEE PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN MCNOOKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIANCARLO GIOVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN MEDICAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARILYN COX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF BRENTON A PALMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL D UPSHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?