NORMAN et al v. MADDOX et al
Plaintiff: JOHN L NORMAN and KEONA S BERG
Defendant: DAVID MADDOX, TIMOTHY JETTON, DIVISION OF RISK MANAGEMENT, CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER SMITH, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, MARK S INCH, SERGEANT WILKES, ALEXANDRA MOORE and CAPTAIN PARRISH
Case Number: 4:2020cv00437
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
2 Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before 11/16/2020, Plaintiffs shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with this court's September 15, 2020, order. Plaintiffs response to this show cause order must be accompanied by: (a) the joint notice required by the September 15, 2020, order OR (b) one of the separate, alternative pleadings authorized by the September 15, 2020, order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 10/29/2020. (jcw)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DEFICIENCY ORDER - The following documents are STRICKEN from the docket, SHALL NOT TAKE EFFECT, and WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED: a. the Motion for Leave to Amend (Doc. 15 ); b. the proposed Amended Civil Rights Complaint (Doc. 16 ); and c. the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. 17 ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 10/29/2020. (jcw)
October 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: 15 MOTION to Amend, 16 Amended Complaint, 17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 ***STRICKEN PER #18 DEFICIENCY ORDER*** NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JOHN L NORMAN. (Document is not signed by all plaintiffs.) (jcw) Modified on 10/29/2020 (jcw).
October 26, 2020 Filing 16 ***STRICKEN PER #18 DEFICIENCY ORDER*** AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by JOHN L NORMAN. (Complaint is not signed by all plaintiffs.) (jcw) Modified on 10/29/2020 (jcw).
October 26, 2020 Filing 15 ***STRICKEN PER #18 DEFICIENCY ORDER*** MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by JOHN L NORMAN. (Document is not signed by all plaintiffs.) (jcw) Modified on 10/29/2020 (jcw).
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DEFICIENCY ORDER - The following documents are STRICKEN from the docket, SHALL NOT TAKE EFFECT, and WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED: a. the Motion for Extension of Time to File Timely Objection (Doc. 10 ); b. the Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Doc. 11 ); c. the proposed Amended Civil Complaint (Doc. 12 ); and d. the Joint Notice (Doc. 13 ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 10/14/2020. (jcw)
October 13, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: 13 JOINT NOTICE re #8 Order. (jcw)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 ***STRICKEN PER #14 ORDER*** JOINT NOTICE re #8 Order by KEONA S BERG, JOHN L NORMAN. (Notice is not signed by Plaintiff Berg.) (jcw) Modified on 10/14/2020 (jcw)..
September 23, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: 12 Amended Complaint, 10 MOTION for Extension of Time, 11 MOTION to Amend. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 ***STRICKEN PER #14 ORDER*** PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOHN L NORMAN. (jcw) Modified on 10/14/2020 (jcw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 ***STRICKEN PER #14 ORDER*** MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by JOHN L NORMAN. (jcw) Modified on 10/14/2020 (jcw).
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 ***STRICKEN PER #14 ORDER*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Timely Objection re #1 Notice of Removal, by JOHN L NORMAN. (jcw) Modified on 10/14/2020 (jcw).
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #1 Complaint. On or before 10/15/2020, Plaintiffs Berg and Norman: (a) shall file a joint notice-signed personally by both Berg and Norman-of their continued interest in prosecuting this case jointly; OR (b) shall file, separately: (i) a motion to sever each Plaintiff's respective claims into a separate, individual action; OR (ii) a notice of voluntary dismissal of a Plaintiff's claims without prejudice (meaning that the Plaintiff could file the same claims at a later date so long as it is within the statute of limitations). The deadlines for Defendants to answer Plaintiffs' complaint are STAYED until further order of this court. Defendants' motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED to the extent that this court has stayed response deadlines. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/15/2020. (jcw)
September 15, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER WITHDRAWING INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. This Court hereby withdraws the Initial Scheduling Order, ECF No. #4 , entered in error on September 10, 2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/15/20. (blb)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by DIVISION OF RISK MANAGEMENT, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, MARK S INCH, DAVID MADDOX, CAPTAIN PARRISH, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER SMITH, SERGEANT WILKES. (KERI, BRIAN) Modified on 9/15/2020 (jcw). Modified on 9/15/2020 (jcw).
September 14, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #6 Notice of Appearance, #5 Notice OF COMPLIANCE. (blb)
September 11, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Discovery due by 1/7/2021. Status Report due by 10/13/2020. (rcb)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 DEFENDANTS, DOCTOR JETTON, AND NURSE MOORE'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (EDWARDS, LINDA) Modified to edit title on 9/11/2020 (rcb).
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 DEFENDANTS DOCTOR JETTON AND NURSE MOORE'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. 1446 AND POSSIBLE NEW ADDRESSES FOR PLAINTIFFS (PLATT RADY, KAYLA) Modified to edit title on 9/11/2020 (rcb).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WITHDRAWN per ORDER #8 :INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/24/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/26/2020. Discovery due by 1/7/2021.Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/10/2020. (rcb) Modified to edit Discovery Date on 9/11/2020 (rcb). Modified on 9/15/2020 (blb).
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. A Notice of Removal was filed on September 8, 2020, and this case was assigned to the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge. ECF No. #1 . However, I hereby recuse myself from this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455. The Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to another Magistrate Judge within this District. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Clerk's Office shall assign another Magistrate Judge to this action based upon my recusal. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 9/9/20. (blb) Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK for all further proceedings. **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:20cv437-MW/MJF**
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PLATT RADY, KAYLA)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TIMOTHY JETTON, ALEXANDRA MOORE from SECOND JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, LEON COUNTY, FL, case number 2020 CA 001220. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5638822.), filed by TIMOTHY JETTON, ALEXANDRA MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Lower Court Documents, #2 Notice of Filing) (PLATT RADY, KAYLA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORMAN et al v. MADDOX et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID MADDOX
Represented By: BRIAN C KERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY JETTON
Represented By: KAYLA ELIZABETH PLATT RADY
Represented By: LINDA BOND EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIVISION OF RISK MANAGEMENT
Represented By: BRIAN C KERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER SMITH
Represented By: BRIAN C KERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: BRIAN C KERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK S INCH
Represented By: BRIAN C KERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT WILKES
Represented By: BRIAN C KERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRA MOORE
Represented By: KAYLA ELIZABETH PLATT RADY
Represented By: LINDA BOND EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN PARRISH
Represented By: BRIAN C KERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN L NORMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEONA S BERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?